Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleCarter-v-United States Department of Justice
DistrictNorthern District of California
CitySan Jose
Case Number5:2018cv02455
Date Filed2018-04-25
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeCaseload Rebalancing Judge
PlaintiffDarryl Carter
DefendantUnited States Department of Justice
Documents
Docket
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2018-04-251NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Santa Clara County Superior Court. Their case number is 18CV324523. (). Filed byUnited States Department of Justice. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit State Court Complaint, # 2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Scharf, James) (Filed on 4/25/2018) (Entered: 04/25/2018)
2018-04-252Case assigned to Judge Nathanael M. Cousins. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening. Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 5/9/2018. (srnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/25/2018) (Entered: 04/25/2018)
2018-04-253Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 7/18/2018. Initial Case Management Conference set for 7/25/2018 10:00 AM in San Jose, Courtroom 7, 4th Floor. (sfbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/25/2018) (Entered: 04/25/2018)
2018-04-254CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by United States Department of Justice re 1 Notice of Removal, Standing Orders (Scharf, James) (Filed on 4/25/2018) (Entered: 04/25/2018)
2018-04-305CLERK'S NOTICE REGARDING Consent or Declination: Parties shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge. by 5/14/2018 Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate/Proof of Service) (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/30/2018) (Entered: 04/30/2018)
2018-05-026CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by United States Department of Justice.. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Scharf, James) (Filed on 5/2/2018) (Entered: 05/02/2018)
2018-05-027Defendant's Answer to Removal Complaint by United States Department of Justice. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Scharf, James) (Filed on 5/2/2018) (Entered: 05/02/2018)
2018-05-088ORDER REGARDING ELECTRONIC ACCESS. Signed by Judge Nathanael Cousins on 5/8/2018. (Attachments: # 1 Motion for Permission for Electronic Case Filing, # 2 Certificate/Proof of Service)(lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/8/2018) (Entered: 05/08/2018)
2018-05-099MOTION and (Proposed) Order granting Permission for Electronic Case Filing filed by Darryl Carter. (sfbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/9/2018) (Entered: 05/10/2018)
2018-05-1010ORDER GRANTING MOTION for Permission for Electronic Case Filing 9 . Signed by Judge Nathanael Cousins. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/10/2018) (Entered: 05/10/2018)
2018-05-1411CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Darryl Carter.. (Carter, Darryl) (Filed on 5/14/2018) (Entered: 05/14/2018)
2018-05-1412CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/14/2018) (Entered: 05/14/2018)
2018-05-1413This case will be randomly reassigned to a District Judge outside the San Jose Division pursuant to the Caseload Rebalancing Pilot Program approved by the Court effective March 1, 2018. For information, visit our web page at http://cand.uscourts.gov/news/225 . (bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/14/2018) (Entered: 05/14/2018)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff