Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleCarter v. Department of Agriculture
DistrictEastern District of Arkansas
CityPine Bluff
Case Number5:2018cv00108
Date Filed2018-04-27
Date Closed2018-05-04
JudgeJudge Billy Roy Wilson
PlaintiffJessie Carter
Case DescriptionJessie Carter filed suit against the Department of Agriculture because he had been placed on its Permanent Exclusion List of Providers. This is not a FOIA suit.
Complaint issues: FOIA not mentioned

DefendantDepartment of Agriculture and its representatives in their official capacity at the USDA
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Opinion/Order [24]
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2018-01-051COMPLAINT against USDA, filed by Jessie Carter.(cnn) [Transferred from arwd on 4/27/2018.] (Entered: 01/05/2018)
2018-01-052MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis and MOTION for Service by Jessie Carter. (cnn) [Transferred from arwd on 4/27/2018.] (Entered: 01/05/2018)
2018-01-053Magistrate Notice/Consent Furnished (cnn) [Transferred from arwd on 4/27/2018.] (Entered: 01/05/2018)
2018-01-054MOTIONS REFERRED: 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis MOTION for Service. Motions referred to Honorable Barry A. Bryant.(cnn) [Transferred from arwd on 4/27/2018.] (Entered: 01/05/2018)
2018-01-095ORDER granting 2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Honorable Barry A. Bryant on January 9, 2018. (cnn) [Transferred from arwd on 4/27/2018.] (Entered: 01/09/2018)
2018-01-096ORDER granting 2 Motion for Service and DIRECTING SERVICE on USDA. Defendant is to answer within 60 days from the date of service. Signed by Honorable Barry A. Bryant on January 9, 2018. (cc: U.S. Marshals Service)(cnn) [Transferred from arwd on 4/27/2018.] (Entered: 01/09/2018)
2018-01-097THE DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO COURT USERS AND CASE PARTICIPANTS. Summons Issued as to USDA, U.S. Attorney and USM285 Form(s) Delivered to USMS for each defendant for whom summons was issued with the following documents attached: re 1 Complaint, 3 Magistrate Notice/Consent, 6 Order on Motion for Service. YOU MUST PRINT THIS ISSUED SUMMONS, WHICH IS THE MAIN DOCUMENT. PAPER COPIES WILL NOT BE MAILED. (cnn) [Transferred from arwd on 4/27/2018.] (Entered: 01/09/2018)
2018-02-068USM 285 FORM/SUMMONS Returned Executed by Jessie Carter. USDA served on 1/25/2018, answer due 3/26/2018. (cnn) [Transferred from arwd on 4/27/2018.] (Entered: 02/06/2018)
2018-02-099USM 285 FORM/SUMMONS Returned Executed on USDA-Washington, DC by Jessie Carter. (cnn) [Transferred from arwd on 4/27/2018.] (Entered: 02/09/2018)
2018-03-2610MOTION to Dismiss Case by USDA. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Declaration of Suzanne Diggs)(Webb, Mark) [Transferred from arwd on 4/27/2018.] (Entered: 03/26/2018)
2018-03-2611MEMORANDUM BRIEF in Support of 10 MOTION to Dismiss Case by USDA. (Webb, Mark) [Transferred from arwd on 4/27/2018.] (Entered: 03/26/2018)
2018-03-2712TEXT ONLY ORDER REFERRING 10 MOTION to Dismiss Case filed by USDA to Honorable Barry A. Bryant, U.S. Magistrate Judge pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 636(b)(1)(A) and Local Rule 72.1. Signed by Honorable Susan O. Hickey on March 27, 2018. Motions referred to Barry A. Bryant.(rwg) [Transferred from arwd on 4/27/2018.] (Entered: 03/27/2018)
2018-03-2913MOTION for Default Judgment as to USDA by Jessie Carter. (cnn) [Transferred from arwd on 4/27/2018.] (Entered: 03/29/2018)
2018-03-3014RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION TO Motion re 13 MOTION for Default Judgment as to USDA filed by USDA. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Summons, # 2 Exhibit Complaint, # 3 Exhibit Order)(Webb, Mark) [Transferred from arwd on 4/27/2018.] (Entered: 03/30/2018)
2018-04-0515RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION TO Motion re 10 MOTION to Dismiss Case filed by Jessie Carter. (cnn) [Transferred from arwd on 4/27/2018.] (Entered: 04/05/2018)
2018-04-0916MOTION to Change Venue by Jessie Carter. (cnn) [Transferred from arwd on 4/27/2018.] (Entered: 04/09/2018)
2018-04-1117TEXT ONLY ORDER REFERRING 13 MOTION for Default Judgment as to USDA filed by Jessie Carter, and 16 MOTION to Change Venue filed by Jessie Carter to Honorable Barry A. Bryant, U.S. Magistrate Judge pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 636(b)(1)(A) and Local Rule 72.1. Signed by Honorable Susan O. Hickey on April 11, 2018. Motions referred to Barry A. Bryant.(rwg) [Transferred from arwd on 4/27/2018.] (Entered: 04/11/2018)
2018-04-1318SUPPLEMENT/Addendum by Plaintiff Jessie Carter to 15 Response to Motion to Dismiss. (cnn) [Transferred from arwd on 4/27/2018.] (Entered: 04/13/2018)
2018-04-2619ORDER granting 16 Motion to Change Venue; ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE to District of Eastern District of Arkansas. Signed by Honorable Barry A. Bryant on April 26, 2018. (cnn) [Transferred from arwd on 4/27/2018.] (Entered: 04/26/2018)
2018-04-2720Case electronically transferred in from District of Arkansas Western; Case Number 1:18-cv-01004. Electronic file copy of transfer order, case file, and docket sheet received. (Entered: 04/27/2018)
2018-04-2721(This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) ORDER denying 13 Plaintiff's Motion for Default Judgment. Signed by Judge Billy Roy Wilson on 04/27/18. (dmm) (Entered: 04/27/2018)
2018-05-0222INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Rule 26(f) Conference to occur by 7/5/2018. Rule 26(f) Report due by 7/19/2018. Bench Trial set for 4/16/2019 at 9:30 AM in Little Rock Courtroom # A401 before Judge Billy Roy Wilson. Entered at the direction of the Court on 5/2/18. (mmb) (Entered: 05/02/2018)
2018-05-0323NOTICE of Appearance by Jamie Goss Dempsey on behalf of Department of Agriculture (Dempsey, Jamie) (Entered: 05/03/2018)
2018-05-0424ORDER granting 10 Defendant's Motion to Dismiss and dismissing this case. Signed by Judge Billy Roy Wilson on 5/4/2018. (ljb) (Entered: 05/04/2018)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff