Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleState of Washington v. Environmental Protection Agency et al
DistrictWestern District of Washington
CitySeattle
Case Number2:2018cv00645
Date Filed2018-05-03
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Ricardo S. Martinez
PlaintiffState of Washington
Case DescriptionThe State of Washington submitted a FOIA request to the EPA for records concerning communications from agency employees to any past or present members of EPA advisory committee members related to a memo from Administrator Scott Pruitt entitled "Strengthening and Improving Membership on EPA Federal Advisory Committees." The State also requested a fee waiver. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request and granted the State's request for a fee waiver. However, after hearing nothing further from the agency, the State of Washington filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Adequacy - Search, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantEnvironmental Protection Agency an agency of the United States
DefendantE. Scott Pruitt in his official capacity as Administrator
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Opinion/Order [7]
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2018-05-031COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Receipt # 0981-5303929) Attorney William R Sherman added to party State of Washington(pty:pla), filed by State of Washington. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons, # 3 Summons)(Sherman, William) (Entered: 05/03/2018)
2018-05-04Judge Ricardo S Martinez added. (RE) (Entered: 05/04/2018)
2018-05-042Summons(es) electronically issued as to defendant(s) Environmental Protection Agency, E. Scott Pruitt (Attachments: # 1 Summons)(RE) (Entered: 05/04/2018)
2018-05-253AFFIDAVIT of Mailing of Summons and Complaint to Environmental Protection Agency on 5/7/2018, filed by Plaintiff State of Washington. (Sherman, William) (Entered: 05/25/2018)
2018-06-084ANSWER to 1 Complaint, Attorney Michelle R. Lambert added to party Environmental Protection Agency(pty:dft) by Environmental Protection Agency.(Lambert, Michelle) (Entered: 06/08/2018)
2018-06-085NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Michelle R. Lambert on behalf of Defendant Environmental Protection Agency. (Lambert, Michelle) (Entered: 06/08/2018)
2018-06-146Stipulated MOTION for relief from initial deadlines , filed by Defendant Environmental Protection Agency. Noting Date 6/14/2018, (Lambert, Michelle) (Entered: 06/14/2018)
2018-06-187STIPULATION AND ORDER for relief from initial deadlines re parties' 6 Stipulated MOTION. The parties are released from the initial disclosure requirements of Rule 26(a)(1), as well as the requirements of Rule 26(f), requiring the parties to prepare a discovery plan. Signed by Judge Ricardo S Martinez. (TH) (Entered: 06/18/2018)
2018-09-128JOINT STATUS REPORT by Defendants Environmental Protection Agency, E. Scott Pruitt (Lambert, Michelle) Modified on 9/13/2018 to "Joint" to docket text (PM). (Entered: 09/12/2018)
2018-09-13NOTICE of Docket Text Modification re 8 Joint Status Report: added "Joint" to docket text. (PM) (Entered: 09/13/2018)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar