Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleJOHNSON v. FEDERAL BUREAU OF PRISONS
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2018cv01025
Date Filed2018-04-25
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Reggie B. Walton
PlaintiffALAN WADE JOHNSON
Case DescriptionAlan Johnson, a federal prisoner, submitted a FOIA request to the Bureau of Prisons for records concerning the food service at the prison in which he was incarcerated. After hearing nothing further from the agency, Johnson filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Recovery of Costs

DefendantFEDERAL BUREAU OF PRISONS
Documents
Docket
Complaint
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2018-04-25Initiating Pleading & IFP Application Received on 4/25/2018. (jd) (Entered: 05/02/2018)
2018-04-251COMPLAINT against FEDERAL BUREAU OF PRISONS filed by ALAN WADE JOHNSON.(jd) (Entered: 05/02/2018)
2018-04-252MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by ALAN WADE JOHNSON. (jd) (Entered: 05/02/2018)
2018-04-253PRISONER TRUST FUND ACCOUNT STATEMENT for period of six months by ALAN WADE JOHNSON. (jd) (Entered: 05/02/2018)
2018-05-074ORDER directing an initial partial filing fee in the amount of $108.77 from Prison Account of ALAN WADE JOHNSON and granting 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis (see order for full details). Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on 5/7/2018. (zrdj) (Entered: 05/11/2018)
2018-05-165NOTICE OF RELATED CASE by ALAN WADE JOHNSON. Case related to Case No. 18-cv-836. (zmd) (Entered: 05/16/2018)
2018-05-16Case Reassigned to Judge Reggie B. Walton. (zmd) (Entered: 05/16/2018)
2018-06-046SUMMONS (3) Issued as to FEDERAL BUREAU OF PRISONS, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (zmd) (Entered: 06/04/2018)
2018-07-258RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. FEDERAL BUREAU OF PRISONS served on 7/24/2018, RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 7/24/2018. ( Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 8/23/2018.), RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 7/24/2018. (tth) (Entered: 07/26/2018)
2018-07-267NOTICE of Appearance by Scott Leeson Sroka on behalf of All Defendants (Sroka, Scott) (Entered: 07/26/2018)
2018-08-239ANSWER to 1 Complaint by FEDERAL BUREAU OF PRISONS.(Sroka, Scott) (Entered: 08/23/2018)
2018-08-2410ORDER directing the defendant to file a status report and proposed briefing schedule for dispositive motions by September 24, 2018. Signed by Judge Reggie B. Walton on 8/24/18. (ms) (Entered: 08/24/2018)
2018-08-24Set/Reset Deadlines: Proposed Briefing Schedule due by 9/24/2018 Status Report due by 9/24/2018 (tj) (Entered: 08/24/2018)
2018-09-2411STATUS REPORT and Proposed Briefing Schedule by FEDERAL BUREAU OF PRISONS. (Sroka, Scott) (Entered: 09/24/2018)
2018-09-24MINUTE ORDER. Upon consideration of the parties' 11 Status Report and Proposed Briefing Schedule, and for good cause shown, it is hereby ORDERED that the defendant shall file his motion for summary judgment on or before October 24, 2018. It is further ORDERED that the plaintiff shall file its opposition to the defendant's motion and cross-motion for summary judgment on or before November 26, 2018. It is further ORDERED that the defendant shall file his reply in support of his motion and opposition to the plaintiff's cross-motion on or before December 10, 2018. Signed by Judge Reggie B. Walton on September 24, 2018. (lcrbw2) (Entered: 09/24/2018)
2018-09-24Set/Reset Deadlines: Summary Judgment motion due by 10/24/2018. Response to Motion for Summary Judgment/Cross Motion due by 11/16/2018. Reply to Motion for Summary Judgment due by 12/10/2018. (hs) (Entered: 09/24/2018)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar