Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleEVANS v. FEDERAL BUREAU OF PRISONS
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2016cv02274
Date Filed2016-11-16
Date Closed2018-02-06
JudgeChief Judge Beryl A. Howell
PlaintiffMICHAEL S. EVANS
DefendantFEDERAL BUREAU OF PRISONS
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2016-11-161COMPLAINT against FEDERAL BUREAU OF PRISONS (Filing fee $ 0.00) filed by MICHAEL S. EVANS. (Attachment: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet)(jd) (Entered: 11/21/2016)
2016-11-162MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by MICHAEL S. EVANS (jd) (Entered: 11/21/2016)
2016-11-16Initiating Pleading & IFP Application Received on 10/25/2016. (jd) (Entered: 11/21/2016)
2016-11-163PRO SE ORDER directing within 30 days of this Order, unless an extension of time is granted, plaintiff to provide a six month trust fund prisoner account statement and failure to comply will result in dismissal of case. Plaintiff shall provide the requested information specific within this order.. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 11/10/2016. (jd) (Entered: 11/21/2016)
2016-12-054PRISONER TRUST FUND ACCOUNT STATEMENT for period of six months by MICHAEL S. EVANS (jd) (Entered: 12/07/2016)
2017-01-265ORDER directing an initial partial filing fee in the amount of $12.69 from Prison Account of MICHAEL S. EVANS and granting 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis (see order for full details). Signed by Chief Judge Beryl A. Howell on 1/24/2017. (zrdj) (Entered: 01/26/2017)
2017-03-03Partial Filing Fee Received from MICHAEL S. EVANS in the amount of $12.69, receipt number: 4616083352. (zrdj) (Entered: 03/06/2017)
2017-04-19Case Assigned to Chief Judge Beryl A. Howell. (sb) (Entered: 04/19/2017)
2017-04-206SUMMONS (3) Issued as to FEDERAL BUREAU OF PRISONS, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (sb) (Entered: 04/21/2017)
2017-05-017RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 4/27/2017. (zrdj) (Entered: 05/02/2017)
2017-05-12Partial Filing Fee Received from MICHAEL S. EVANS in the amount of $3.20, receipt number: 4616084519. (zrdj) (Entered: 05/12/2017)
2017-05-238NOTICE of Appearance by Johnny Hillary Walker, III on behalf of FEDERAL BUREAU OF PRISONS (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Walker, Johnny) (Entered: 05/23/2017)
2017-05-309RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. FEDERAL BUREAU OF PRISONS served on 5/22/2017, RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 5/22/2017. ( Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 6/21/2017.) (jf) (Entered: 05/31/2017)
2017-06-0210MOTION to Appoint Counsel by MICHAEL S. EVANS (jf) (Entered: 06/05/2017)
2017-06-1211ORDER denying without prejudice the plaintiff's 10 Motion to Appoint Counsel. Signed by Chief Judge Beryl A. Howell on 6/12/17. (ms) (Entered: 06/12/2017)
2017-06-2112ANSWER to 1 Complaint by FEDERAL BUREAU OF PRISONS. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Walker, Johnny) (Entered: 06/21/2017)
2017-06-22MINUTE ORDER: This action proceeds under the Freedom of Information Act against the Federal Bureau of Prisons, a component of the United States Department of Justice. Before the Court are this incarcerated plaintiff's pro se complaint and defendant's answer. The requirements of Local Civil Rule 16.3 and Federal Rules of Civil Procedure Rule 26(f) do not apply. It is hereby ORDERED that defendant shall file a proposed schedule for filing dispositive motions by July 21, 2017. Signed by Chief Judge Beryl A. Howell on 6/22/17. (ms) (Entered: 06/22/2017)
2017-06-3013MOTION to Appoint Counsel by MICHAEL S. EVANS (zrdj) (Entered: 07/03/2017)
2017-07-1014SUPPLEMENT re 13 MOTION to Appoint Counsel filed by MICHAEL S. EVANS. (zrdj) (Entered: 07/12/2017)
2017-07-2115PROPOSED BRIEFING SCHEDULE by FEDERAL BUREAU OF PRISONS. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Walker, Johnny) (Entered: 07/21/2017)
2017-07-27MINUTE ORDER: It is hereby ORDERED that the plaintiff's motion to appoint counsel 13 is DENIED WITHOUT PREJUDICE for the same reasons set forth in the Court' June 12, 2017 Order. It is FURTHER ORDERED that the defendant shall file its motion for summary judgment by August 21, 2017; the plaintiff shall file his opposition and cross-motion, if any, by September 20, 2017; the defendant shall file its opposition and reply by October 20, 2017; and the plaintiff shall file his reply by November 20, 2017. Signed by Chief Judge Beryl A. Howell on 7/27/17. (ms) (Entered: 07/27/2017)
2017-07-27Set/Reset Deadlines: Summary Judgment motion due by 8/21/2017; Cross-Motion and Opposition to Motion for Summary Judgment due by 9/20/2017; Opposition to Cross-Motion and Reply to Opposition to Motion for Summary Judgment due by 10/20/2017; Reply to Opposition to Cross Motion due by 11/20/2017. (tg) (Entered: 07/27/2017)
2017-08-2116MOTION for Summary Judgment by FEDERAL BUREAU OF PRISONS (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support, # 2 Statement of Facts, # 3 Declaration of Sharon Wahl (with exhibits), # 4 Text of Proposed Order, # 5 Certificate of Service)(Walker, Johnny) (Entered: 08/21/2017)
2017-08-2817Order advising plaintiff to respond by 9/20/2017 to the defendant's 16 Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Chief Judge Beryl A. Howell on 8/28/17. (ms) (Entered: 08/28/2017)
2017-08-28Set/Reset Deadlines: Plaintiff Response due by 9/20/2017 To The Defendant's 16 Motion For Summary Judgment. (mac) (Entered: 08/28/2017)
2017-08-2818MOTION to Appoint Counsel by MICHAEL S. EVANS (jf) (Entered: 08/29/2017)
2017-08-30MINUTE ORDER: Plaintiff's 18 Motion to Appoint Counsel is hereby DENIED. Signed by Chief Judge Beryl A. Howell on 8/30/17. (ms) (Entered: 08/30/2017)
2017-09-2219Memorandum in opposition to re 16 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by MICHAEL S. EVANS. (zrdj) (Entered: 09/26/2017)
2017-10-0320REPLY to opposition to motion re 16 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by FEDERAL BUREAU OF PRISONS. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Walker, Johnny) (Entered: 10/03/2017)
2017-11-0821SURREPLY to re 16 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by MICHAEL S. EVANS. "Leave to File GRANTED," signed by Chief Judge Beryl A. Howell. (zrdj) Modified to add fiat on 11/13/2017 (znmw). (Entered: 11/09/2017)
2018-02-0522ORDER granting 16 Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment. This is a final appealable Order. Signed by Chief Judge Beryl A. Howell on 2/5/18. (ms) (Entered: 02/05/2018)
2018-02-0523MEMORANDUM AND OPINION. Signed by Chief Judge Beryl A. Howell on 2/5/18. (ms) (Entered: 02/05/2018)
2018-02-0524NOTICE of Change of Address by MICHAEL S. EVANS (zrdj) (Entered: 02/09/2018)
2018-03-0525NOTICE of Change of Address by MICHAEL S. EVANS (zrdj) (Entered: 03/07/2018)
2018-03-0526NOTICE OF APPEAL as to 22 Order on Motion for Summary Judgment, 23 Memorandum & Opinion by MICHAEL S. EVANS. Fee Status: No Fee Paid. Parties have been notified. (zrdj) (Entered: 03/07/2018)
2018-03-0727Transmission of the Notice of Appeal, Order Appealed (Memorandum Opinion), and Docket Sheet to US Court of Appeals. The fee remains to be paid and another notice will be transmitted when the fee has been paid in the District Court re 26 Notice of Appeal. (zrdj) (Entered: 03/07/2018)
2018-03-13USCA Case Number 18-5068 for 26 Notice of Appeal filed by MICHAEL S. EVANS. (zrdj) (Entered: 03/13/2018)
2018-04-2628ORDER of USCA ORDERED that the motion to appeal in forma pauperis be referred to the district court for resolution in the first instance and that this case be held in abeyance pending further order of the court as to 26 Notice of Appeal filed by MICHAEL S. EVANS. USCA Case Number 18-5068. (zrdj) (Entered: 04/30/2018)
2018-04-2629MOTION for Leave to Appeal in forma pauperis by MICHAEL S. EVANS (zrdj) (Entered: 04/30/2018)
2018-05-01MINUTE ORDER: The plaintiff's 29 Motion for Leave to Appeal in forma pauperis is hereby GRANTED. Signed by Chief Judge Beryl A. Howell on 5/1/18. (ms) (Entered: 05/01/2018)
2018-05-0130Supplemental Record on Appeal transmitted to US Court of Appeals re 29 MOTION for Leave to Appeal in forma pauperis, 26 Notice of Appeal. USCA Case Number 18-05068. (zrdj) (Entered: 05/01/2018)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar