Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleCASEY v. FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2017cv00009
Date Filed2017-01-04
Date Closed2018-03-23
JudgeJudge Tanya S. Chutkan
PlaintiffBRIAN M. CASEY
DefendantFEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION
DefendantDAVID HARDY
TERMINATED: 01/04/2017
DefendantPRISCILLA JONES
TERMINATED: 01/04/2017
DefendantCHRISTINA D. TROIANI
TERMINATED: 01/04/2017
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2017-01-041COMPLAINT against FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION filed by BRIAN M. CASEY. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet)(td) (Entered: 01/05/2017)
2017-01-042PRISONER ACCOUNT STATEMENT by BRIAN M. CASEY (td) (Entered: 01/05/2017)
2017-01-043ORDER dismissing complaint against the individual defendants-David Hardy, Priscilla Jones, and Christina D. Troiani. Signed by Chief Judge Beryl A. Howell on 1/3/17. (SEE ORDER FOR FURTHER DETAILS) (td) (Entered: 01/05/2017)
2017-01-044ORDER granting In Forma Pauperis (SEE ORDER FOR FURTHER DETAILS). Signed by Chief Judge Beryl A. Howell on 1/3/17. (td). (Entered: 01/05/2017)
2017-01-04SUMMONS (3) Issued as to FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (td) (Entered: 01/05/2017)
2017-01-125RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 1/10/2017. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 3/11/2017. (td) (Entered: 01/12/2017)
2017-01-136RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 1/12/17., RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION served on 1/12/2017 (td) (Entered: 01/13/2017)
2017-02-0710MOTION to Appoint Counsel by BRIAN M. CASEY (td) (Entered: 02/10/2017)
2017-02-087LEAVE TO FILE DENIED- Plaintiff's Amended Complaint "LEAVE TO FILE DENIED Leave to file document under seal is denied. See Local Rule 5.1(h)" This document is unavailable as the Court denied its filing (td) (Entered: 02/08/2017)
2017-02-098NOTICE of Appearance by Andrew Donald Fiorillo on behalf of FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION (Fiorillo, Andrew) (Entered: 02/09/2017)
2017-02-099ANSWER to 1 Complaint by FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION.(Fiorillo, Andrew) (Entered: 02/09/2017)
2017-02-0911NOTICE of Multi-Jurisdictional Litigation and Referral of Cases to Judicial Panel on Multi-jurisdictional Litigation by BRIAN M. CASEY (td) (Entered: 02/14/2017)
2017-03-0112MOTION for Briefing Schedule by FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Fiorillo, Andrew) (Entered: 03/01/2017)
2017-03-0113MOTION to Construe Above Case as 42 USC 1981, MOTION to Strike 9 Answer to Complaint by BRIAN M. CASEY (td) (Entered: 03/02/2017)
2017-03-0114MOTION for Sanctions by BRIAN M. CASEY; (See Docket Entry No. 13 to view document.) (td) (Entered: 03/02/2017)
2017-03-02MINUTE ORDER: It is ORDERED that Defendant's Motion for a Briefing Schedule [Dkt. 12] is GRANTED. The parties shall adhere to the following schedule: Defendant shall file its dispositive motion on or before March 31, 2017; Plaintiff shall file his opposition to the dispositive motion on or before May 12, 2017; Defendant shall file any reply on or before May 22, 2017. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Tanya S. Chutkan on 3/2/17.(ah) (Entered: 03/02/2017)
2017-03-0215ORDER denying 10 Plaintiff's Motion to Appoint Counsel (see written order for details). Signed by Judge Tanya S. Chutkan on 3/2/17.(ah) (Entered: 03/02/2017)
2017-03-0216MOTION for Default Judgment by BRIAN M. CASEY (td) (Entered: 03/06/2017)
2017-03-0217MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by BRIAN M. CASEY (td) (Entered: 03/06/2017)
2017-03-03Set/Reset Deadlines: Dispositive Motion due by 3/31/2017. Response to Dispositive Motion due by 5/12/2017. Reply to Dispositive Motion due by 5/22/2017. (tb) (Entered: 03/03/2017)
2017-03-2018NOTICE OF INTERLOCUTORY APPEAL as to 15 Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel, Order on Motion for Briefing Schedule, by BRIAN M. CASEY. Fee Status: No Fee Paid. Parties have been notified. (td) (Entered: 03/22/2017)
2017-03-2219Transmission of the Notice of Appeal, Order Appealed, and Docket Sheet to US Court of Appeals. The Fee remains to be paid and another notice will be transmitted when the fee has been paid in the District Court re 18 Notice of Interlocutory Appeal. (td) (Entered: 03/22/2017)
2017-03-2720MOTION for Leave to Appeal in forma pauperis by BRIAN M. CASEY (Attachments: # 1 IFP Application)(td) (Entered: 03/29/2017)
2017-03-2721PRISONER ACCOUNT STATEMENT by BRIAN M. CASEY (td) (Entered: 03/29/2017)
2017-03-2722MOTION for Extension of Time to file Brief and Motion to Stay by BRIAN M. CASEY (zrdj) (Entered: 03/30/2017)
2017-03-28USCA Case Number 17-5051 for 18 Notice of Interlocutory Appeal filed by BRIAN M. CASEY. (zrdj) (Entered: 03/28/2017)
2017-03-3023MOTION for Summary Judgment by FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION (Attachments: # 1 Declaration, # 2 Exhibit, # 3 Statement of Facts, # 4 Memorandum in Support, # 5 Text of Proposed Order)(Fiorillo, Andrew) Modified on 3/22/2018 (zrdj). (Entered: 03/30/2017)
2017-03-3124ORDER denying 13 Plaintiff's Motion for Order; denying 13 Plaintiff's Motion to Strike ; denying 14 Plaintiff's Motion for Sanctions; denying 16 Plaintiff's Motion for Default Judgment; denying 17 Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunction; denying 20 Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to Appeal in forma pauperis; denying 22 Plaintiff's Motion for Extension of Time (see written order for details). Signed by Judge Tanya S. Chutkan on 3/31/17.(ah) (Entered: 03/31/2017)
2017-03-3125Order advising plaintiff to respond by May 12, 2017, to defendant's motion for summary judgment or risk entry of judgment in defendant's favor (see written order for details). Signed by Judge Tanya S. Chutkan on 3/31/17.(ah) (Entered: 03/31/2017)
2017-04-1926MOTION to Strike 23 MOTION for Summary Judgment , MOTION for Order to Show Cause by BRIAN M. CASEY (td) (Entered: 04/21/2017)
2017-07-0327MOTION to set hearing on Motion to Construe Pleading as 42 USC 1988, Motion to Enter Default, Motion to Enter Default and Order to Show Cause by BRIAN M. CASEY (td) Modified relief on 7/7/2017 (td). (Entered: 07/06/2017)
2017-07-0328MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings 42 USC 1988 attached to Motion to Construe as 42 USC 1988 by BRIAN M. CASEY (td) Modified relief on 7/7/2017 (td). (Entered: 07/06/2017)
2017-07-0329NOTICE Of Habeas Corpus Testificandum by BRIAN M. CASEY (td) (Entered: 07/06/2017)
2017-07-2030RESPONSE re 28 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings, 27 MOTION for Hearing and 29 NOTICE of Habeas Corpus Testificandum filed by FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION. (Fiorillo, Andrew) (Entered: 07/20/2017)
2017-09-1131NOTICE of Change of Address by BRIAN M. CASEY (md) (Entered: 09/14/2017)
2017-09-1132Supplemental Record on Appeal transmitted to US Court of Appeals re 31 Notice of Change of Address. USCA Case Number 17-05051. (md) (Entered: 09/14/2017)
2017-09-1133MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by BRIAN M. CASEY (td) Modified to delete duplicate relief on 9/18/2017 (td). (Entered: 09/15/2017)
2017-09-1334ORDER of USCA ORDERED that the motion to appeal in forma pauperis be referred to the district court for resolution in the first instance and that this case be held in abeyance pending further order of the court as to 18 Notice of Interlocutory Appeal filed by BRIAN M. CASEY. USCA Case Number 17-5051. (zrdj) (Entered: 09/18/2017)
2017-09-18MINUTE ORDER: It is ORDERED that 33 Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to Appeal in forma pauperis is DENIED for the same reasons stated on page two of the March 31, 2017 Order, ECF No. 24. Plaintiff is appealing one or both orders issued on March 2, 2017. Neither order is appealable and neither merits an interlocutory appeal under 28 U.S.C. § 1292(b). Therefore, pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1915(a)(3), the court certifies that Plaintiff's appeal is not taken in good faith and denies leave to appeal in forma pauperis. SO ORDERED. The deputy clerk shall transmit this order promptly to the Court of Appeals. Signed by Judge Tanya S. Chutkan on 9/18/17. (ah) (Entered: 09/18/2017)
2017-09-1835Supplemental Record on Appeal transmitted to US Court of Appeals re Order on Motion for Leave to Appeal in forma pauperis,, ; USCA Case Number 17-5051. (td) (Entered: 09/18/2017)
2018-03-2336ORDER granting 23 Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment; denying 26 Plaintiff's Motion to Strike and for Order to Show Cause; denying 27 Plaintiff's Motion for Hearing; denying 28 Plaintiff's Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings, entering judgment for the Defendant and closing the case, all for the reasons stated in the Memorandum Opinion issued separately this day. Signed by Judge Tanya S. Chutkan on 3/23/28.(ah) (Entered: 03/23/2018)
2018-03-2337MEMORANDUM OPINION accompanying final order issued separately this day. Signed by Judge Tanya S. Chutkan on 3/23/18.(ah) (Entered: 03/23/2018)
2018-04-0538Mail Returned as Undeliverable: Memorandum Opinion and Order 37 , 36 were returned undeliverable. No forwarding address provided. (tb) (Entered: 04/05/2018)
2018-04-2039MOTION for Hearing by BRIAN M. CASEY; "LEAVE TO FILE GRANTED" signed 4/20/18 by Judge Tanya Chutkan (td) (Entered: 04/23/2018)
2018-05-02MINUTE ORDER denying 39 Plaintiff's Motion for Hearing, as this case has been dismissed. The Deputy Clerk shall enclose with this order the final Order 36 and accompanying Memorandum Opinion 37 and shall mail the documents to plaintiff's changed address: South Florida Reception Center, 14000 NW 41st Street, Doral, Florida 33178-3003. Signed by Judge Tanya S. Chutkan on 5/2/18.(ah) (Entered: 05/02/2018)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff