Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleMCCOY v. UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY et al
DistrictEastern District of Pennsylvania
CityPhiladelphia
Case Number2:2018cv02003
Date Filed2018-05-11
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeHONORABLE MARK A. KEARNEY
PlaintiffD'ANN MCCOY
Case DescriptionAnn McCoy submitted FOIA requests to the Department of Homeland Security for records concerning herself. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request. McCoy inquired several times about the status of her requests, but after hearing nothing from the agency, McCoy filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantUNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY
DefendantUNITED STATES IMMIGRATION AND CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT
DefendantUNITED STATES CITIZENSHIP AND IMMIGRATION SERVICES
DefendantUNITED STATES CUSTOMS AND BORDER PROTECTION
Documents
Docket
Complaint
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2018-05-111COMPLAINT FOR DECLARATORY AND INJUCTIVE RELIEF against UNITED STATES CITIZENSHIP AND IMMIGRATION SERVICES, UNITED STATES CUSTOMS AND BORDER PROTECTION, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, UNITED STATES IMMIGRATION AND CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 178287), filed by D'ANN MCCOY.(ti, ) Modified on 5/14/2018 (ti, ). (Entered: 05/14/2018)
2018-05-11Summons Issued as to UNITED STATES CITIZENSHIP AND IMMIGRATION SERVICES, UNITED STATES CUSTOMS AND BORDER PROTECTION, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, UNITED STATES IMMIGRATION AND CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT, One Original Given to the U.S. Attorney and Five Originals Forwarded To: Counsel on 5/14/18 (ti, ) (Entered: 05/14/2018)
2018-05-162Acceptance of Service by U.S. Attorney Re: accepted summons and complaint on behalf of the United States Attorney (only). (jl, ) (Entered: 05/17/2018)
2018-06-113Joint MOTION to Place in Suspense (Hold Matter in Abeyance) filed by UNITED STATES CITIZENSHIP AND IMMIGRATION SERVICES, UNITED STATES CUSTOMS AND BORDER PROTECTION, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, UNITED STATES IMMIGRATION AND CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT.Certificate of Service.(SCICCHITANO, ANTHONY) (Entered: 06/11/2018)
2018-06-124ORDER THAT JOINT MOTION TO PLACE THE MATTER IN SUSPENSE AND FINDING NO GROUNDS TO PLACE THE MATTER IN SUSPENSE BUT ALLOWING THE PARTIES TIME TO FINALIZE THEIR SETTLEMENT IS DENIED AS STATED BUT WE GRANT LEAVE FOR THE DEFENDANT TO ANSWER THE COMPLAINT NO LATER THAN AUGUST 31, 2018. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MARK A. KEARNEY ON 6/12/18.6/12/18 ENTERED AND COPIES EMAILED TO COUNSEL.(jaa, ) (Entered: 06/12/2018)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff