Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleLATHAM & WATKINS LLP v. UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2018cv01167
Date Filed2018-05-18
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Amit P. Mehta
PlaintiffLATHAM & WATKINS LLP
Case DescriptionThe law firm of Latham & Watkins submitted 13 FOIA requests to the Department of Health and Human Services for records from the National Cancer Institute. The agency acknowledged receipt of the requests, but after hearing nothing further from the agency, Latham & Watkins filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantUNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
Complaint attachment 6
Complaint attachment 7
Complaint attachment 8
Complaint attachment 9
Complaint attachment 10
Complaint attachment 11
Complaint attachment 12
Complaint attachment 13
Complaint attachment 14
Complaint attachment 15
Complaint attachment 16
Complaint attachment 17
Complaint attachment 18
Complaint attachment 19
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2018-05-181COMPLAINT against UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-5488604) filed by LATHAM & WATKINS LLP. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H, # 9 Exhibit I, # 10 Exhibit J, # 11 Exhibit K, # 12 Exhibit L, # 13 Exhibit M, # 14 Exhibit N, # 15 Exhibit O, # 16 Civil Cover Sheet, # 17 Summons to United States Department of Health and Human Services, # 18 Summons to U.S. Attorney General, # 19 Summons to U.S. Attorney for DC)(Prins, Andrew) (Entered: 05/18/2018)
2018-05-182Corporate Disclosure Statement by LATHAM & WATKINS LLP. (Prins, Andrew) (Entered: 05/18/2018)
2018-05-18Case Assigned to Judge Amit P. Mehta. (zmd) (Entered: 05/21/2018)
2018-05-253SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zsb) (Entered: 05/25/2018)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff