Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleLATHAM & WATKINS LLP v. UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2018cv01170
Date Filed2018-05-18
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Royce C. Lamberth
PlaintiffLATHAM & WATKINS LLP
Case DescriptionThe law firm of Latham & Wilkins submitted four FOIA requests to the Department of Health and Human Services for records from the National Institute of Environmental Health Sciences. The agency acknowledged receipt of the requests, but after hearing nothing further from the agency, Latham & Watkins filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantUNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
Complaint attachment 6
Complaint attachment 7
Complaint attachment 8
Complaint attachment 9
Complaint attachment 10
Complaint attachment 11
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2018-05-181COMPLAINT against UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-5488797) filed by LATHAM & WATKINS LLP. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H, # 9 Civil Cover Sheet, # 10 Summons to United States Department of Health and Human Services, # 11 Summons to U.S. Attorney General)(Prins, Andrew) (Entered: 05/18/2018)
2018-05-182REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO ISSUE to U.S. Attorney for D.C. filed by LATHAM & WATKINS LLP.(Prins, Andrew) (Entered: 05/18/2018)
2018-05-183Corporate Disclosure Statement by LATHAM & WATKINS LLP. (Prins, Andrew) (Entered: 05/18/2018)
2018-05-21Case Assigned to Judge Royce C. Lamberth. (zsb) (Entered: 05/21/2018)
2018-05-214SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zsb) (Entered: 05/21/2018)
2018-05-225ERRATA by LATHAM & WATKINS LLP 1 Complaint, filed by LATHAM & WATKINS LLP. (Attachments: # 1 Corrected Complaint)(Prins, Andrew) (Entered: 05/22/2018)
2018-06-286ANSWER to Complaint by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES.(Simon, Jeremy) (Entered: 06/28/2018)
2018-07-117NOTICE of Appearance by Bridget R. Reineking on behalf of LATHAM & WATKINS LLP (Reineking, Bridget) (Entered: 07/11/2018)
2018-08-158Joint STATUS REPORT by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES. (Simon, Jeremy) (Entered: 08/15/2018)
2018-10-259Joint STATUS REPORT by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES. (Simon, Jeremy) (Entered: 10/25/2018)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar