Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleEDDINGTON v. U.S. CUSTOMS AND BORDER PROTECTION et al
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2018cv01185
Date Filed2018-05-21
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Timothy J. Kelly
PlaintiffPATRICK EDDINGTON
Case DescriptionPatrick Eddington, an analyst at the Cato Institute, submitted a FOIA request to U.S. Customs and Border Protection for records concerning confrontations with persons at internal CBP immigration checkpoints where the confrontation lasted more than 15 minutes or CBP agents forcibly removed an individual from a vehicle. One year later, the agency told Eddington that it found no records responsive to the first part of his request and that the second part of his request was too broad to search. Eddington filed an administrative appeal, but after hearing nothing further from the agency, Eddington filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantU.S. IMMIGRATION & CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT
TERMINATED: 05/21/2018
DefendantU.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY
DefendantU.S. CUSTOMS AND BORDER PROTECTION
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
Complaint attachment 6
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2018-05-211COMPLAINT against U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, U.S. CUSTOMS AND BORDER PROTECTION ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-5491747) filed by PATRICK EDDINGTON. (Attachments: # 1 Summons, # 2 Summons, # 3 Exhibit, # 4 Summons, # 5 Summons, # 6 Civil Cover Sheet)(Burday, Joshua) (Attachment 6 replaced on 5/22/2018) (zmd). (Entered: 05/21/2018)
2018-05-212NOTICE OF CORRECTED COMPLAINT against U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, U.S. CUSTOMS AND BORDER PROTECTION filed by PATRICK EDDINGTON. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)(Burday, Joshua) (Entered: 05/21/2018)
2018-05-213NOTICE OF CORRECTED COMPLAINT against U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, U.S. CUSTOMS AND BORDER PROTECTION filed by PATRICK EDDINGTON. (Attachments: # 1 Summons, # 2 Exhibit, # 3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Burday, Joshua) (Attachment 3 replaced on 5/22/2018) (zmd). (Entered: 05/21/2018)
2018-05-21Case Assigned to Judge Timothy J. Kelly. (zmd) (Entered: 05/22/2018)
2018-05-244SUMMONS (4) Issued Electronically as to U.S. CUSTOMS AND BORDER PROTECTION, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: # 1 Notice and Consent) (zmd) (Entered: 05/24/2018)
2018-06-135RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 6/6/2018. (Burday, Joshua) (Entered: 06/13/2018)
2018-06-136RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 6/6/2018. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 7/6/2018. (Burday, Joshua) (Entered: 06/13/2018)
2018-06-137RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. U.S. CUSTOMS AND BORDER PROTECTION served on 6/6/2018 (Burday, Joshua) (Entered: 06/13/2018)
2018-06-138RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY served on 6/5/2018 (Burday, Joshua) (Entered: 06/13/2018)
2018-07-029ANSWER to 3 Amended Complaint, by U.S. CUSTOMS AND BORDER PROTECTION, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY.(Hendry, Melanie) (Entered: 07/02/2018)
2018-07-03MINUTE ORDER: Before the Court in this FOIA case are a complaint and an answer. It is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall meet, confer, and file a joint proposed schedule for briefing or disclosure by July 20, 2018. Signed by Judge Timothy J. Kelly on 7/3/2018. (lctjk1) (Entered: 07/03/2018)
2018-07-2010Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. CUSTOMS AND BORDER PROTECTION, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY. (Hendry, Melanie) (Entered: 07/20/2018)
2018-07-20MINUTE ORDER: In light of the parties' 10 Joint Status Report, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall file a further joint status report by September 20, 2018. Signed by Judge Timothy J. Kelly on 7/20/2018. (lctjk1) (Entered: 07/20/2018)
2018-07-23Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 9/20/2018. (kh) (Entered: 07/23/2018)
2018-09-2011Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. CUSTOMS AND BORDER PROTECTION, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY. (Hendry, Melanie) (Entered: 09/20/2018)
2018-10-11MINUTE ORDER: In light of the parties' 11 Joint Status Report, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall file a further joint status report by December 7, 2018. Signed by Judge Timothy J. Kelly on 10/11/2018. (lctjk1) (Entered: 10/11/2018)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar