Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleHUSCH BLACKWELL LLP v. UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2018cv01186
Date Filed2018-05-21
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Timothy J. Kelly
PlaintiffHUSCH BLACKWELL LLP
Case DescriptionThe law firm of Husch Blackwell submitted a FOIA request to the National Institute of Environmental Health Sciences for emails sent over a specific period containing specific keywords. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request, but after hearing nothing further from the agency, Husch Blackwell filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantUNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
Complaint attachment 6
Complaint attachment 7
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2018-05-211COMPLAINT against UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-5492288) filed by HUSCH BLACKWELL LLP. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Civil Cover Sheet, # 5 Summons (Jefferson Sessions), # 6 Summons (U.S. Dept. of Health and Human Services), # 7 Summons (Civil Process Clerk))(Gilster, Kyle) (Entered: 05/21/2018)
2018-05-212Corporate Disclosure Statement by HUSCH BLACKWELL LLP. (Gilster, Kyle) (Entered: 05/21/2018)
2018-05-21Case Assigned to Judge Timothy J. Kelly. (zmd) (Entered: 05/22/2018)
2018-05-243SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: # 1 Notice and Consent) (zmd) (Entered: 05/24/2018)
2018-06-074NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew Diehr on behalf of HUSCH BLACKWELL LLP (Diehr, Matthew) (Entered: 06/07/2018)
2018-06-145RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES served on 6/5/2018 (Diehr, Matthew); Modified on 6/21/2018 to correct the party served. (tth) (Entered: 06/14/2018)
2018-06-146RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 06/08/2018. (Diehr, Matthew) (Entered: 06/14/2018)
2018-06-197RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 6/11/2018. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 7/11/2018. (Diehr, Matthew) (Entered: 06/19/2018)
2018-07-108NOTICE of Appearance by Scott Leeson Sroka on behalf of UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES (Sroka, Scott) (Entered: 07/10/2018)
2018-07-119ANSWER to Complaint by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES.(Sroka, Scott) (Entered: 07/11/2018)
2018-07-13MINUTE ORDER: Before the Court in this FOIA case are a complaint and an answer. It is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall meet, confer, and file a joint proposed schedule for briefing or disclosure by July 27, 2018. Signed by Judge Timothy J. Kelly on 7/13/2018. (lctjk1) (Entered: 07/13/2018)
2018-07-16Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Proposed Briefing Schedule due by 7/27/2018. (kh) (Entered: 07/16/2018)
2018-07-2710MOTION for Extension of Time to File Joint Status Report by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES (Sroka, Scott) (Entered: 07/27/2018)
2018-07-31MINUTE ORDER: Defendant's 10 Motion for Extension of Time to File Joint Proposed Schedule for Briefing or Disclosure does not comply with Local Civil Rule 7(m). The Court will not deny the Motion on this ground, but any further nondispositive motion filed in this case must include the information required by Rule 7(m). The Court treats the Motion as opposed. It is hereby ORDERED that, nunc pro tunc and for good cause shown, the Motion is GRANTED. The parties shall meet, confer, and file a joint proposed schedule for briefing or disclosure by August 3, 2018. Signed by Judge Timothy J. Kelly on 7/31/2018. (lctjk1) (Entered: 07/31/2018)
2018-07-31Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Proposed Briefing Schedule or Disclosure due by 8/3/2018. (kh) (Entered: 07/31/2018)
2018-08-0311Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Status Report and Briefing Schedule by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES (Sroka, Scott) (Entered: 08/03/2018)
2018-08-07MINUTE ORDER granting, nunc pro tunc, the parties' 11 Joint Motion for Extension of Time to File Joint Proposed Schedule for Briefing or Disclosure. The parties shall meet, confer, and file a joint proposed schedule for briefing or disclosure by August 17, 2018. Signed by Judge Timothy J. Kelly on 8/7/2018. (lctjk1) (Entered: 08/07/2018)
2018-08-07Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Proposed Briefing Schedule or Disclosure due by 8/17/2018. (kh) (Entered: 08/07/2018)
2018-08-1512Joint STATUS REPORT by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES. (Sroka, Scott) (Entered: 08/15/2018)
2018-08-16MINUTE ORDER: In light of the 12 Joint Status Report, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall file a further joint status report by September 17, 2018. Signed by Judge Timothy J. Kelly on 8/16/2018. (lctjk1) (Entered: 08/16/2018)
2018-09-1413Joint STATUS REPORT by HUSCH BLACKWELL LLP. (Diehr, Matthew) (Entered: 09/14/2018)
2018-10-10MINUTE ORDER: In light of the parties' 13 Joint Status Report, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall file a further joint status report by October 29, 2018. Signed by Judge Timothy J. Kelly on 10/10/2018. (lctjk1) (Entered: 10/10/2018)
2018-10-2914NOTICE of Appearance by Natalie R Holden on behalf of HUSCH BLACKWELL LLP (Holden, Natalie) (Entered: 10/29/2018)
2018-10-2915Joint STATUS REPORT by HUSCH BLACKWELL LLP. (Holden, Natalie) (Entered: 10/29/2018)
2018-10-30MINUTE ORDER: In light of the parties' 15 Joint Status Report, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall file a further joint status report by November 29, 2018. Signed by Judge Timothy J. Kelly on 10/30/2018. (lctjk1) (Entered: 10/30/2018)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar