Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleHUSCH BLACKWELL LLP v. UNITED STATES ENVIRONMENTAL PROTECTION AGENCY
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2018cv01213
Date Filed2018-05-23
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Amit P. Mehta
PlaintiffHUSCH BLACKWELL LLP
Case DescriptionThe law firm of Husch Blackwell submitted 27 FOIA requests to the EPA for records concerning emails sent during a specified time that included certain keywords. The agency acknowledged receipt of the requests. The agency consolidated the 27 requests for search purposes and told Husch Blackwell that its search located 4,100 potentially responsive records. But after hearing nothing further from the agency, Husch Blackwell filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantUNITED STATES ENVIRONMENTAL PROTECTION AGENCY
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
Complaint attachment 6
Complaint attachment 7
Complaint attachment 8
Complaint attachment 9
Complaint attachment 10
Complaint attachment 11
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2018-05-231COMPLAINT against UNITED STATES ENVIRONMENTAL PROTECTION AGENCY ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-5497896) filed by HUSCH BLACKWELL LLP. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons, # 3 Exhibit 1, # 4 Exhibit 2, # 5 Exhibit 3, # 6 Exhibit 4, # 7 Exhibit 5, # 8 Exhibit 6, # 9 Exhibit 7, # 10 Exhibit 8, # 11 Exhibit 9)(Gilster, Kyle) (Entered: 05/23/2018)
2018-05-232Corporate Disclosure Statement by HUSCH BLACKWELL LLP. (Gilster, Kyle) (Entered: 05/23/2018)
2018-05-23Case Assigned to Judge Amit P. Mehta. (zmd) (Entered: 05/25/2018)
2018-05-243ERRATA to Correct by HUSCH BLACKWELL LLP 1 Complaint, filed by HUSCH BLACKWELL LLP. (Attachments: # 1 Revised Pg 1 of Complaint, # 2 Summons U.S. Attorney General, # 3 Summons U.S. Attorney)(Gilster, Kyle) (Entered: 05/24/2018)
2018-05-294SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to UNITED STATES ENVIRONMENTAL PROTECTION AGENCY, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: # 1 Notice and Consent) (zmd) (Entered: 05/29/2018)
2018-06-075NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew Diehr on behalf of HUSCH BLACKWELL LLP (Diehr, Matthew) (Entered: 06/07/2018)
2018-06-146RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. UNITED STATES ENVIRONMENTAL PROTECTION AGENCY served on 6/11/2018 (Diehr, Matthew) Modified to correct party served on 7/3/2018 (ztd). (Entered: 06/14/2018)
2018-06-147RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 6/8/2018. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 7/8/2018. (Diehr, Matthew) (Entered: 06/14/2018)
2018-06-148RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 06/06/2018. (Diehr, Matthew) (Entered: 06/14/2018)
2018-07-099NOTICE of Appearance by Joshua M. Kolsky on behalf of UNITED STATES ENVIRONMENTAL PROTECTION AGENCY (Kolsky, Joshua) (Entered: 07/09/2018)
2018-07-0910ANSWER to Complaint by UNITED STATES ENVIRONMENTAL PROTECTION AGENCY.(Kolsky, Joshua) (Entered: 07/09/2018)
2018-07-10MINUTE ORDER. Both a Complaint and an Answer are now before the court in this FOIA case. It is hereby ordered that the parties shall meet and confer and file a Joint Status Report on or before July 24, 2018. The Joint Status Report shall include: (1) the status of Plaintiff's FOIA request; (2) the anticipated number of documents responsive to Plaintiff's FOIA request; (3) the anticipated date(s) for release of the documents requested by Plaintiff; (4) whether a motion for stay is likely under Open America v. Watergate Special Prosecution Force, 547 F.2d 605 (D.C. Cir. 1976); and (5) whether the parties anticipate summary judgment briefing and, if so, a proposed briefing schedule. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 7/10/2017. (lcapm2) (Entered: 07/10/2018)
2018-07-10Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 7/24/2018. (zjd) (Entered: 07/11/2018)
2018-07-2411Joint STATUS REPORT by HUSCH BLACKWELL LLP. (Diehr, Matthew) (Entered: 07/24/2018)
2018-07-26MINUTE ORDER. In light of the parties' 11 Joint Status Report, the parties shall file an additional Joint Status Report on or before August 14, 2018, in which the parties advise the court whether further litigation will be required in this matter and, if so, proposes a summary judgment briefing schedule. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 7/26/2018. (lcapm2) (Entered: 07/26/2018)
2018-07-26Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 8/14/2018. (zjd) (Entered: 07/27/2018)
2018-08-1412Joint STATUS REPORT by UNITED STATES ENVIRONMENTAL PROTECTION AGENCY. (Kolsky, Joshua) (Entered: 08/14/2018)
2018-08-17MINUTE ORDER. In light of the parties' 12 Joint Status Report, the parties shall file an additional Joint Status Report on or before September 14, 2018, that advises the court whether further litigation will be required and, if so, proposes a summary judgment briefing schedule. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 8/17/2018. (lcapm2) (Entered: 08/17/2018)
2018-08-17Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 9/14/2018. (zjd) (Entered: 08/20/2018)
2018-09-1413Joint STATUS REPORT by HUSCH BLACKWELL LLP. (Diehr, Matthew) (Entered: 09/14/2018)
2018-09-17MINUTE ORDER. In light of the parties' 13 Joint Status Report, the parties shall file an additional Joint Status Report on or before October 26, 2018, in which the parties advise the court whether further litigation will be required in this matter and, if so, proposes a summary judgment briefing schedule. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 9/17/2018. (Entered: 09/17/2018)
2018-09-17Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 10/26/2018. (zjd) (Entered: 09/18/2018)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar