Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleZaorski v. The Government of the United States of America
DistrictEastern District of North Carolina
CityWestern Division
Case Number5:2018cv00234
Date Filed2018-05-24
Date Closed2019-04-25
JudgeDistrict Judge James C. Dever, III
PlaintiffLan Lin Zaorski
Case DescriptionLan Lin Zaorski filed suit against the Government of the United States over sovereignty issues concerning Taiwan. This is not a FOIA claim.
Complaint issues: FOIA not mentioned

DefendantThe Government of the United States of America
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Opinion/Order [20]
Opinion/Order [21]
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2018-05-241COMPLAINT against The Government of the United States of America (Filing fee $ 400.00 receipt number RAL054497), filed by Lan Lin Zaorski. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Information regarding Sox Formosan, # 2 Exhibit Inquiries from Formosan Human Rights Initiative, # 3 Exhibit Confirmation upon petition receivership from Formosa and the Pescadores, # 4 Civil Cover Sheet) (Rudd, D.) (Entered: 05/24/2018)
2018-05-242Notice of Self-Representation filed by Lan Lin Zaorski. (Rudd, D.) (Entered: 05/24/2018)
2018-05-243Financial Disclosure Statement filed by Lan Lin Zaorski. (Rudd, D.) (Entered: 05/24/2018)
2018-05-244Summons Issued as to The Government of the United States of America. Summons issued at intake. (Rudd, D.) (Entered: 05/24/2018)
2018-09-055Notice to Plaintiff of Failure to Make Service within 90 Days regarding defendant The Government of the United States of America. Sent to Lan Lin Zaorski at 5709 Big Sandy Drive Raleigh, NC 27616 via US Mail. (Sellers, N.) (Entered: 09/05/2018)
2018-09-116Document: Proof of Service on Jeff Sessions on 6/7/2018 filed by Lan Lin Zaorski. (Sellers, N.) (Entered: 09/11/2018)
2018-09-277Affidavit of Service for Summons and Complaint filed by Lan Lin Zaorski served on Mr. Robert Higdon, U.S. Attorney for the Eastern District of North Carolina on 9/18/2018. (Attachments: # 1 Envelope) (Sellers, N.) (Entered: 09/27/2018)
2018-11-168Notice of Appearance filed by Roberto F. Ramirez on behalf of The Government of the United States of America. (Ramirez, Roberto) (Entered: 11/16/2018)
2018-11-169MOTION for Extension of Time until December 19, 2018 to respond to Plaintiff's Complaint filed by The Government of the United States of America. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order) (Ramirez, Roberto) (Entered: 11/16/2018)
2018-11-19Motion Referred to Peter A. Moore, Jr., Clerk of Court regarding 9 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer. (Sellers, N.) (Entered: 11/19/2018)
2018-11-1910ORDER granting 9 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. The Government of the United States of America answer due 12/19/2018. Signed by Peter A. Moore, Jr., Clerk of Court on 11/19/2018. Sent to Lan Lin Zaorski at 5709 Big Sandy Drive Raleigh, NC 27616 via US Mail. (Sellers, N.) (Entered: 11/19/2018)
2018-12-1711Second MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 1 Complaint, up to and including January 18, 2018, filed by The Government of the United States of America. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order) (Ramirez, Roberto) (Entered: 12/17/2018)
2018-12-18Motion Submitted to District Judge James C. Dever III regarding 11 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer. (Sellers, N.) (Entered: 12/18/2018)
2018-12-1812ORDER granting 11 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. The Government of the United States of America answer due 1/18/2019. Signed by District Judge James C. Dever III on 12/18/2018. (Sellers, N.) (Entered: 12/18/2018)
2019-01-1613Notice of Appearance filed by Joshua B. Royster on behalf of The Government of the United States of America. (Royster, Joshua) (Entered: 01/16/2019)
2019-01-1614Third MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 1 Complaint, up to and including February 19, 2019 filed by The Government of the United States of America. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order) (Royster, Joshua) (Entered: 01/16/2019)
2019-01-16Motion Submitted to District Judge James C. Dever, III regarding 14 Third MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 1 Complaint, up to and including February 19, 2019 . (Stouch, L.) (Entered: 01/16/2019)
2019-01-1715ORDER granting 14 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response to Complaint. The response deadline is hereby extended up to and including February 19, 2019. Signed by US District Judge James C. Dever, III on 1/17/2019. Sent to Lan Lin Zaorski at 5709 Big Sandy Drive Raleigh, NC 27616 via US Mail. (Stouch, L.) (Entered: 01/17/2019)
2019-02-1916MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction or in the alternative , MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by The Government of the United States of America. (Ramirez, Roberto) (Entered: 02/19/2019)
2019-02-1917Memorandum in Support regarding 16 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction or in the alternative MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by The Government of the United States of America. (Ramirez, Roberto) (Entered: 02/19/2019)
2019-02-1918Rule 12 Letter Issued as to 16 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction or in the alternative MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM. Response due by 3/15/2019. Sent to Lan Lin Zaorski at 5709 Big Sandy DriveRaleigh, NC 27616 via US Mail. (Sellers, N.) (Entered: 02/19/2019)
2019-03-1419RESPONSE in Opposition regarding 16 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction or in the alternative MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Lan Lin Zaorski. (Sellers, N.) (Entered: 03/14/2019)
2019-04-01Motion Submitted to District Judge James C. Dever III regarding 16 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction or in the alternative MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM. (Sellers, N.) (Entered: 04/01/2019)
2019-04-2520ORDER granting 16 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction; granting 16 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. Signed by District Judge James C. Dever III on 4/25/2019. (Sellers, N.) (Entered: 04/25/2019)
2019-04-2521JUDGMENT - IT IS ORDERED, ADJUDGED, AND DECREED that for the reasons stated in defendant's memorandum of law, the court GRANTS defendant's motion to dismiss [D.E. 16] and DISMISSES the action without prejudice. Signed by Peter A. Moore, Jr., Clerk of Court on 4/25/2019. (Sellers, N.) (Entered: 04/25/2019)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar