Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitlePatino v. Director,Office of Management and Budget
DistrictNorthern District of California
CitySan Jose
Case Number5:2018cv03147
Date Filed2018-05-25
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeMagistrate Judge Virginia K DeMarchi
PlaintiffAntonio Patino
Case DescriptionAntonio Patino submitted a FOIA request to OMB for records concerning a Form 83-1 request for OMB review. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request, but after hearing nothing further from the agency, Patino filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantDirector,Office of Management and Budget
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2018-05-251COMPLAINT against Director,Office of Management and Budget. No process. (Filing fee $ 400. receipt #54611017524). Filed by Antonio Patino. Consent/Declination due by 6/8/2018. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet)(dhmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/25/2018) (Entered: 05/30/2018)
2018-05-252Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 8/21/2018. Initial Case Management Conference set for 8/28/2018 01:30 PM in San Jose, Courtroom 2, 5th Floor. (Attachments: # 1 Standing Order)(dhmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/25/2018) (Entered: 05/30/2018)
2018-06-013Summons Issued as to U.S. Attorney General (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/1/2018) (Entered: 06/01/2018)
2018-06-014Summons Issued as to U.S. Attorney General, U.S. Department of Justice (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/1/2018) (Entered: 06/01/2018)
2018-06-015Summons Issued as to The Office of General Council Office of Management and Budget. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/1/2018) (Entered: 06/01/2018)
2018-06-046ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Virginia K DeMarchi for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd no longer assigned to the case.. Signed by Judge Executive Committee on 6/4/18. (pmc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/4/2018) (Entered: 06/05/2018)
2018-06-057CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Antonio Patino. (dhmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/5/2018) (Entered: 06/06/2018)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff