Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleHUMANA GOVERNMENT BUSINESS, INC. v. DEFENSE HEALTH AGENCY
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2018cv01246
Date Filed2018-05-29
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Emmet G. Sullivan
PlaintiffHUMANA GOVERNMENT BUSINESS, INC.
doing business as HUMANA MILITARY
Case DescriptionHumana Government Business, Inc. filed a reverse-FOIA suit against the Defense Health Agency after the agency decided to disclose allegedly proprietary information from its contract with the agency.
Complaint issues: Litigation - Reverse-FOIA - Confidential business information

DefendantDEFENSE HEALTH AGENCY
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2018-05-291COMPLAINT against DEFENSE HEALTH AGENCY ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-5504610) filed by HUMANA GOVERNMENT BUSINESS, INC.. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons)(Hurst, Paul) (Entered: 05/29/2018)
2018-05-292LCvR 7.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by HUMANA GOVERNMENT BUSINESS, INC. (Hurst, Paul) (Entered: 05/29/2018)
2018-05-29Case Assigned to Judge Emmet G. Sullivan. (zmd) (Entered: 05/30/2018)
2018-05-30SUMMONS Not Issued as to DEFENSE HEALTH AGENCY, U.S. Attorney, U.S. Attorney General. (zmd) (Entered: 05/30/2018)
2018-05-313STANDING ORDER: The parties are directed to read the attached Standing Order Governing Civil Cases Before Judge Emmet G. Sullivan in its entirety upon receipt. The parties are hereby ORDERED to comply with the directives in the attached Standing Order. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on 05/31/18. (Attachment: # 1 Exhibit 1) (mac) (Entered: 05/31/2018)
2018-06-154ERRATA Corrected Civil Cover Sheet by HUMANA GOVERNMENT BUSINESS, INC.. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet Corrected Civil Cover Sheet)(Hurst, Paul) (Entered: 06/15/2018)
2018-06-155REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO ISSUE filed by HUMANA GOVERNMENT BUSINESS, INC.. (Attachments: # 1 Summons U.S. Attorney Summons, # 2 Summons U.S. Attorney-General Summons)(Hurst, Paul) (Entered: 06/15/2018)
2018-06-186SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to DEFENSE HEALTH AGENCY, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (jf) (Entered: 06/18/2018)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff