Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleALFORD v. O'ROURKE
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2018cv01311
Date Filed2018-06-01
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Royce C. Lamberth
PlaintiffLEROY ALFORD
Case DescriptionLeroy Alford submitted a FOIA request to the Department of Veterans Affairs for records concerning his appeal to the Board of Veterans Appeals. After hearing nothing further from the agency, Alford filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Recovery of Costs

DefendantPETER O'ROURKE Acting Secretary, Department of Veterans Affairs Agency
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2018-06-011COMPLAINT against PETER O'ROURKE (Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 4616092289) with Jury Demand filed by LEROY ALFORD. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibits, # 2 Civil Cover Sheet) (tth) (Entered: 06/04/2018)
2018-06-01SUMMONS Not Issued as to PETER O'ROURKE. (tth) (Entered: 06/04/2018)
2018-06-012NOTICE OF RELATED CASE by LEROY ALFORD. Case related to Case No. 16-cv-2170. (tth) (Entered: 06/04/2018)
2018-06-04SUMMONS (3) Issued as to PETER O'ROURKE, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (zmd) (Entered: 06/04/2018)
2018-07-063NOTICE of Appearance by April Denise Seabrook on behalf of All Defendants (Seabrook, April) (Entered: 07/06/2018)
2018-07-064MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 1 Complaint by PETER O'ROURKE (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Seabrook, April) (Entered: 07/06/2018)
2018-07-095CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by PETER O'ROURKE re 4 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 1 Complaint . (Seabrook, April) (Entered: 07/09/2018)
2018-08-066MOTION for Extension of Time to File Responsive Pleading by PETER O'ROURKE (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order, # 2 Exhibit)(Seabrook, April) (Entered: 08/06/2018)
2018-08-077CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by PETER O'ROURKE re 6 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Responsive Pleading . (Seabrook, April) (Entered: 08/07/2018)
2018-08-088ORDER granting, nunc pro tunc 4 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer of PETER O'ROURKE; answer due 8/6/18. Signed by Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 8/7/18. (lsj) (Entered: 08/08/2018)
2018-08-089ORDER granting 6 Motion for Extension of Time to File; Answer due by 8/13/2018. Signed by Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 8/7/18. (lsj) (Entered: 08/08/2018)
2018-08-1310MOTION for Summary Judgment or in the Alternative Motion to Dismiss by PETER O'ROURKE (Attachments: # 1 Statement of Facts, # 2 Declaration, # 3 Declaration)(Peterson, Benton). Added MOTION to Dismiss on 8/14/2018 (jf). (Entered: 08/13/2018)
2018-08-1311ENTERED IN ERROR.....MOTION to Dismiss or in the Alternative Motion for Summary Judgment by PETER O'ROURKE (Attachments: # 1 Statement of Facts, # 2 Declaration, # 3 Declaration)(Peterson, Benton) Modified on 8/14/2018 (jf). (Entered: 08/13/2018)
2018-08-14NOTICE OF ERROR re 11 Motion to Dismiss; emailed to benton.peterson@usdoj.gov, cc'd 5 associated attorneys -- The PDF file you docketed contained errors: 1. Invalid attorney signature, 2. DO NOT REFILE- Signature should match filing atty and d (Entered: 08/14/2018)
2018-08-14NOTICE OF CORRECTED DOCKET ENTRY: Document No. re 11 MOTION to Dismiss or in the Alternative Motion for Summary Judgment was entered in error as a duplicate filing to entry 10 . Missing event added to entry 10 . (jf) (Entered: 08/14/2018)
2018-08-3112MOTION for Extension of Time, MOTION to Enforce Discovery by LEROY ALFORD (Attachments: # 1 Exhibits)(zrdj) (Entered: 09/04/2018)
2018-09-1213NOTICE of Proposed Order by LEROY ALFORD re 12 MOTION for Extension of Time to MOTION to Enforce (jf) (Entered: 09/14/2018)
2018-09-1814ORDER granting 12 Motion for Extension of Time to and denying 12 Motion to Enforce. Plaintiff's Response to Dispositive Motions due by 10/17/2018. Signed by Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 9/17/18. (lsj) (Entered: 09/18/2018)
2018-10-1715RESPONSE re 10 MOTION for Summary Judgment or in the Alternative Motion to Dismiss filed by LEROY ALFORD. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibits)(jf) (Entered: 10/19/2018)
2018-10-2416NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF APPEARANCE as to PETER O'ROURKE. Attorney Benton Gregory Peterson terminated. (Peterson, Benton) (Entered: 10/24/2018)
2018-10-2417Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 10 MOTION for Summary Judgment or in the Alternative Motion to Dismiss by PETER O'ROURKE (Seabrook, April) (Entered: 10/24/2018)
2018-11-0718MOTION to Amend/Correct 1 Complaint by LEROY ALFORD (ztd) (Entered: 11/08/2018)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar