Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleNeal v. NAACP
DistrictDistrict of Maryland
CityBaltimore
Case Number1:2018cv01580
Date Filed2018-06-01
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Paul W. Grimm
PlaintiffJoseph Kenneth Neal
Case DescriptionJoseph Neal submitted a request for information to the NAACP. When the NAACP failed to respond, Neal filed suit. This is not a FOIA claim.
Complaint issues: FOIA not mentioned

DefendantNAACP Civil Rights Organization
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2018-06-011COMPLAINT against NAACP, filed by Joseph Kenneth Neal. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Proposed Summons)(bas, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 06/01/2018)
2018-06-012MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Joseph Kenneth Neal(bas, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 06/01/2018)
2018-06-013LETTER ORDER REGARDING THE FILING OF MOTIONS. Signed by Judge Paul W. Grimm on 6/1/2018. (kns, Deputy Clerk)(c/m 6/1/18) (Entered: 06/01/2018)
2018-07-114MOTION to Dismiss (Request to Drop Case) by Joseph Kenneth Neal (Attachments: # 1 Envelope)(heps, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 07/12/2018)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff