Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleCortes v. Corrections
DistrictDistrict of Connecticut
CityNew Haven
Case Number3:2018cv00923
Date Filed2018-06-04
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Vanessa L. Bryant
PlaintiffJose Cortes
Case DescriptionJose Cortes, a state prisoner, ordered some law books through the Department of Corrections. When he did not receive them, he filed suit against the Department of Corrections. This is not a FOIA suit.
Complaint issues: FOIA not mentioned

DefendantDepartment of Corrections
Documents
Docket
Complaint
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2018-06-041PRISCS - COMPLAINT against Department of Corrections, filed by Jose Cortes.(Fazekas, J.) (Entered: 06/04/2018)
2018-06-042PRISCS - MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Jose Cortes. (Fazekas, J.) (Entered: 06/04/2018)
2018-06-043PRISCS - ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER Signed by Judge Vanessa L. Bryant on 6/4/2018.(Fazekas, J.) Modified on 6/4/2018 to correct judge (Fazekas, J.). (Entered: 06/04/2018)
2018-06-044PRISCS - STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER Signed by Judge Vanessa L. Bryant on 6/4/2018.(Fazekas, J.) (Entered: 06/04/2018)
2018-06-045PRISCS - STANDING ORDER ON PRISONER ELECTRONIC FILING PROGRAM Signed by Judge Janet C. Hall on 6/4/2018.(Fazekas, J.) (Entered: 06/04/2018)
2018-06-046Docket Entry Correction re 3 Electronic Filing Order TO CORRECT JUDGE. (Fazekas, J.) (Entered: 06/04/2018)
2018-06-087Notice to petitioner re: Insufficiency 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis. You must submit the attached Prisoner's IFP application which is being sent to you via U.S mail. If insufficiency not corrected Dismissal due by 6/29/2018 Signed by Judge William I. Garfinkel on 6/8/2018.(Payton, R.) (Entered: 06/08/2018)
2018-06-228MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Jose Cortes. (Hernandez, T.) (Entered: 06/25/2018)
2018-06-289ORDER granting 8 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis; denying 2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. If you change your address at any time during the litigation of this case, Local rule 83.1(c)2 provides that you notify the court. Failure to do so can result in the dismissal of your case. Signed by Judge William I. Garfinkel on 6/28/2018. (Payton, R.) (Entered: 06/28/2018)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff