Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleO'Neill v. United States Department of Justice, The
DistrictDistrict of South Carolina
CityCharleston
Case Number2:2018cv01517
Date Filed2018-06-04
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeHonorable David C Norton
PlaintiffJohn David O'Neill
Case DescriptionJohn O'Neill, an attorney representing individuals suing for injuries caused by defective air bags, submitted a request to the Department of Justice for records concerning documents compiled by the Criminal Division. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request, but denied it under Exemption 7(A) (interference with ongoing investigation or proceeding). O'Neill filed an administrative appeal of that decision, but after hearing nothing further from the agency, O'Neill filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantUnited States Department of Justice, The Criminal Division
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2018-06-041COMPLAINT against United States Department of Justice, The ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-7814494.), filed by John David O'Neill. Service due by 9/4/2018 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibits to Complaint)(jbry, ) (Entered: 06/05/2018)
2018-06-042Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by John David O'Neill.(jbry, ) (Entered: 06/05/2018)
2018-06-043Summons Issued as to United States Department of Justice, The. U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (jbry, ) (Entered: 06/05/2018)
2018-06-045MOTION to Compel Preparation of a Vaughn Index by John David O'Neill. Response to Motion due by 6/18/2018. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. No proposed order.(jbry, ) (Entered: 06/05/2018)
2018-08-107CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by John David O'Neill re 1 Complaint, 3 Summons Issued as to USA, 5 MOTION to Compel, 2 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories Affidavit of Process Server (Dean, Kevin) (Entered: 08/10/2018)
2018-08-108DELETION OF DOCKET ENTRY NUMBER 6 Reason: Attorney refiled with correct signature. Corrected Filing Document Number 7 (jbry, ) (Entered: 08/10/2018)
2018-08-109Summons Issued as to U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (jbry, ) (Entered: 08/10/2018)
2018-08-2010SUMMONS Returned Executed by John David O'Neill. United States Department of Justice, The served on 8/13/2018, answer due 10/12/2018. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Process Server)(Dean, Kevin) (Main Document 10 replaced on 8/21/2018) (jbry, ). Modified on 8/21/2018 to replace with corrected document provided by filing user (jbry, ). (Entered: 08/20/2018)
2018-08-2011SUMMONS Returned Executed by John David O'Neill. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Process Server)(Dean, Kevin) (Main Document 11 replaced on 8/21/2018) (jbry, ). Modified on 8/21/2018 to replace with corrected document provided by filing user (jbry, ). (Entered: 08/20/2018)
2018-08-2012CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by John David O'Neill re 1 Complaint, 3 Summons Issued as to USA, 5 MOTION to Compel, 2 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service Affidavit of Service of Process)(Dean, Kevin) (Entered: 08/20/2018)
2018-08-2014CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by John David O'Neill re 1 Complaint, 3 Summons Issued as to USA, 5 MOTION to Compel, 2 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories Re: Notice of Filing of Affidavits of Service (Dean, Kevin) (Entered: 08/20/2018)
2018-08-2115DELETION OF DOCKET ENTRY NUMBER 13 Reason: Filed in error by the attorney who requested deletion. (jbry, ) (Entered: 08/21/2018)
2018-09-1216ANSWER to Complaint by United States Department of Justice, The.(Bowens, Barbara) (Entered: 09/12/2018)
2018-09-1217RESPONSE in Opposition re 5 MOTION to Compel Response filed by United States Department of Justice, The.Reply to Response to Motion due by 9/19/2018 Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6. (Bowens, Barbara) (Entered: 09/12/2018)
2018-09-1318Amended ANSWER to 1 Complaint by United States Department of Justice, The.(Bowens, Barbara) (Entered: 09/13/2018)
2018-09-1919NOTICE of Hearing on Motion 5 MOTION to Compel : Motion Hearing set for Friday, 10/19/2018 at 11:00 AM in Hon. Sol Blatt, Jr., Courtroom, J. Waties Waring Judicial Cntr, 83 Meeting St, Charleston before Honorable David C Norton. (jbry, ) (Entered: 09/19/2018)
2018-09-1920REPLY to Response to Motion re 5 MOTION to Compel Response filed by John David O'Neill. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Takata Plea Agreement)(Dean, Kevin) (Entered: 09/19/2018)
2018-10-0221CONFERENCE AND SCHEDULING ORDER Rule 26(f) Conference Deadline 10/24/2018, 26(a) Initial Disclosures due by 11/7/2018, Rule 26 Report due by 11/7/2018, Motions to Amend Pleadings due by 12/4/2018, Plaintiffs ID of Expert Witness due by 1/4/2019, Defendants ID of Expert Witnesses Due by 2/4/2019, Discovery due by 6/3/2019, Motions in Limine due at least three weeks prior to jury selection, Motions due by 6/17/2019, Bench Trial Deadline 8/1/2019, ADR Statement due by 7/1/2019, Mediation Due by 7/31/2019, Signed by Honorable David C Norton on 10/2/2018. (jbry, ) (Entered: 10/02/2018)
2018-10-1922Minute Entry. Proceedings held before Honorable David C Norton: taking under advisement 5 Motion to Compel; Motion Hearing held on 10/19/2018 re 5 MOTION to Compel filed by John David O'Neill. Court Reporter Tana Hess. (cmur, ) (Entered: 10/19/2018)
2018-11-0723Joint Rule 26(f) Report by United States Department of Justice, The.(Bowens, Barbara) (Entered: 11/07/2018)
2018-11-0924CONFERENCE AND SCHEDULING ORDER Motions by the United States due by 1/30/2019, Plaintiff's responsive dispositive motion is due on or before March 15, 2019. Additional details regarding evidence, discovery and trial within order. Signed by Honorable David C Norton on 11/9/2018. (jbry, ) (Entered: 11/09/2018)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar