Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleROYCE v. UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2018cv01355
Date Filed2018-06-07
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Timothy J. Kelly
PlaintiffSYLVIA ROYCE
Case DescriptionSylvia Royce, an attorney specializing in international prisoner transfers, submitted a FOIA request to the Department of Justice for records concerning statistics about approvals and denials of international prisoner transfer applications. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request, but after hearing nothing further from the agency, Royce filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Vaughn index, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantUNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2018-06-071COMPLAINT under the Freedom of Information Act against UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE (Fee Status:Filing Fee Waived) filed by SYLVIA ROYCE. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Royce, Sylvia) (Attachment 1 replaced on 6/8/2018) (zmd). (Entered: 06/07/2018)
2018-06-07Case Assigned to Judge Timothy J. Kelly. (zmd) (Entered: 06/08/2018)
2018-06-08SUMMONS Not Issued as to UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, U.S. Attorney, U.S. Attorney General (zmd) (Entered: 06/08/2018)
2018-06-12Filing fee received: $ 400, receipt number: 4616092767. (zmd) (Entered: 06/12/2018)
2018-06-132REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO ISSUE to U.S. Attorney General and U.S. Attorney for District of Columbia re 1 Complaint, filed by SYLVIA ROYCE. Related document: 1 Complaint, filed by SYLVIA ROYCE. (Attachments: # 1 Summons)(Royce, Sylvia) (Entered: 06/13/2018)
2018-06-143SUMMONS (2) Issued Electronically as to U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (jf) (Entered: 06/14/2018)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff