Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleAlford v. Boston Celtics et al
DistrictDistrict of Massachusetts
CityBoston
Case Number1:2018cv11203
Date Filed2018-06-08
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Denise J. Casper
PlaintiffRickey Alford
Case DescriptionRickey Alford, a state prisoner, submitted a request to the Boston Celtics. When the Celtics did not respond, Alford filed suit. This is not a FOIA claim.
Complaint issues: FOIA not mentioned

DefendantBoston Celtics
DefendantClub NBA
DefendantBrad Stevens Coach
Documents
Docket
Complaint
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2018-06-081COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Rickey Alford.(Castilla, Francis) (Entered: 06/08/2018)
2018-06-082MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Rickey Alford.(Castilla, Francis) (Entered: 06/08/2018)
2018-06-083General Order 09-1, dated January 6, 2009 regarding the E-Government Act and Personal Identifiers entered. (Castilla, Francis) (Entered: 06/08/2018)
2018-06-084ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge Denise J. Casper assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Marianne B. Bowler. (Danieli, Chris) (Entered: 06/08/2018)
2018-06-115Judge Denise J. Casper: ORDER entered denying without prejudice 2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis...Accordingly, plaintiff=s motion for leave to proceed without prepayment of the filing fee is hereby DENIED without prejudice. If plaintiff elects to proceed with this action, within 21 days of the date of this Procedural Order, he either must (1) pay the $400.00 filing and administrative fees ; or (2) file a renewed motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis accompanied by his certified prison account statement. Failure of plaintiff to comply with this directive may result in a dismissal of this action without prejudice... (PSSA, 5) (Entered: 06/11/2018)
2018-07-066MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Rickey Alford.(McKillop, Matthew) (Entered: 07/06/2018)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff