Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleSNYDER v. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE et al
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2018cv01389
Date Filed2018-06-12
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly
PlaintiffDAVID L. SNYDER in his capacity as counsel for Andrew G. McCabe
Case DescriptionDavid Snyder, an attorney representing fired FBI agent Andrew McCabe, filed suit against the Department of Justice, claiming that the Inspector General's manual and other FBI guidance on investigations were documents that were required to be disclosed under Section (a)(2) pertaining to affirmative disclosure.
Complaint issues: Litigation - Attorney's fees, Affirmative disclosure

DefendantU.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE
DefendantU.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE OFFICE OF THE INSPECTOR GENERAL
DefendantFEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2018-06-121COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-5530994) filed by DAVID L SNYDER. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons, # 3 Summons, # 4 Summons)(Snyder, David) (Entered: 06/12/2018)
2018-06-132LCvR 7.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by DAVID L SNYDER (Snyder, David) (Entered: 06/13/2018)
2018-06-14Case Assigned to Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly. (zsb) (Entered: 06/14/2018)
2018-06-153REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO ISSUE re 1 Complaint filed by DAVID L. SNYDER. Related document: 1 Complaint filed by DAVID L. SNYDER. (Attachments: # 1 Summons, # 2 Summons)(Snyder, David) (Entered: 06/15/2018)
2018-06-184SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE OFFICE OF THE INSPECTOR GENERAL. (Attachment: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zsb) (Entered: 06/18/2018)
2018-06-215RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE served on 6/18/2018 (Snyder, David) (Entered: 06/21/2018)
2018-06-216RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION served on 6/18/2018 (Snyder, David) (Entered: 06/21/2018)
2018-06-217RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE OFFICE OF THE INSPECTOR GENERAL served on 6/18/2018 (Snyder, David) (Entered: 06/21/2018)
2018-06-218RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 6/19/2018. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 7/19/2018. (Snyder, David) (Entered: 06/21/2018)
2018-07-139SEALED MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE DOCUMENT UNDER SEAL filed by DAVID L. SNYDER (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.) (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support, # 2 Declaration, # 3 Text of Proposed Order)(Snyder, David) (Entered: 07/13/2018)
2018-07-1610SEALED ORDER GRANTING re 9 SEALED MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE DOCUMENT UNDER SEAL filed by DAVID L. SNYDER (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.) filed by DAVID L. SNYDER.(This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on 7/16/18.(zdot) (Entered: 07/16/2018)
2018-07-1711Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 1 Complaint or to Otherwise Respond to the Complaint by FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE OFFICE OF THE INSPECTOR GENERAL (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Sandberg, Justin) (Entered: 07/17/2018)
2018-07-18MINUTE ORDER. The Court is in receipt of Defendants' 11 Consent Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint. Defendants request an additional week to respond to Plaintiff's Complaint because defense counsel needs additional time to coordinate with agency counsel. This is the first request for an extension of this deadline, and Plaintiff consents. Defendants' Motion is GRANTED. Defendants shall respond to Plaintiff's Complaint by no later than JULY 26, 2018. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on 7/18/2018. (lcckk3) (Entered: 07/18/2018)
2018-07-18Set/Reset Deadlines: Answer to Complaint due by 7/26/2018. (dot) (Entered: 07/18/2018)
2018-07-2612ANSWER to Complaint by FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE OFFICE OF THE INSPECTOR GENERAL.(Coyle, Garrett) (Entered: 07/26/2018)
2018-07-2613ORDER. The parties shall file a Joint Status Report by no later than AUGUST 16, 2018. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on 7/26/2018. (lcckk3) (Entered: 07/26/2018)
2018-07-26Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 8/16/2018. (dot) (Entered: 07/27/2018)
2018-08-1614Joint STATUS REPORT by FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE OFFICE OF THE INSPECTOR GENERAL. (Sandberg, Justin) (Entered: 08/16/2018)
2018-08-17MINUTE ORDER. The Court is in receipt of the parties' 14 Joint Status Report. The parties represent that they are in the process of conferring regarding Plaintiff's FOIA request and Defendants' production schedule, and ask to be allowed to submit an additional Joint Status Report in one week. The parties are ORDERED to file a further Joint Status Report, updating the Court on the status of Defendants' processing of Plaintiff's FOIA request by no later than AUGUST 23, 2018. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on 8/17/2018. (lcckk3) (Entered: 08/17/2018)
2018-08-17Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 8/23/2018, updating the Court on the status of Defendants' processing of Plaintiff's FOIA request. (dot) (Entered: 08/22/2018)
2018-08-2315Joint STATUS REPORT by FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE OFFICE OF THE INSPECTOR GENERAL. (Sandberg, Justin) (Entered: 08/23/2018)
2018-08-24MINUTE ORDER. The Court is in receipt of the parties' 15 Joint Status Report. The parties represent that they are in the process of conferring about the status of this case, and that a new issue "came to light yesterday for the first time." To be able to properly address this issue, the parties ask to be allowed to submit an additional Joint Status Report by September 4, 2018. The parties are ORDERED to file a further Joint Status Report, updating the Court on the status of Defendants' processing of Plaintiff's FOIA request by no later than SEPTEMBER 4, 2018. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on 8/24/2018. (lcckk3) (Entered: 08/24/2018)
2018-08-24Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 9/4/2018, updating the Court on the status of Defendants' processing of Plaintiff's FOIA request.(dot) (Entered: 08/24/2018)
2018-09-0416Joint STATUS REPORT by FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE OFFICE OF THE INSPECTOR GENERAL. (Sandberg, Justin) (Entered: 09/04/2018)
2018-09-04MINUTE ORDER. The Court is in receipt of the parties' 16 Joint Status Report. The parties represent that the OIG has released a partially redacted copy of the O&R Manual, a copy of the list of appendices to the O&R Manual with minor redactions, and the first five appendices to the O&R Manual without redactions. These productions have totaled 171 pages. The remaining request, with some tentative narrowing, encompasses about 850 more pages to be processed. The parties have agreed on a schedule for processing the remaining pages, with OIG processing 100 pages-per-month. OIG will produce non-exempt documents or portions of documents on the last work day of every month, beginning September 28, 2018, until the processing is complete. Despite this progress, Defendants request to move for summary judgment as to the FOIA claims against the FBI on October 5, 2018. The Court will not permit Defendants to file a motion for summary judgement absent a further showing that it is not feasible to simultaneously continue with FOIA claims against the OIG and the FBI. The Court is disinclined to permit a "bifurcation" of Plaintiff's FOIA claims against the OIG and against the FBI. Such bifurcation is not in the interest of the Court's efficiency as it may eventually result in two rounds of summary judgment briefing. The parties are ORDERED to submit a further Joint Status Report, updating the Court on the status of Defendants' processing of Plaintiff's FOIA request, by no later than OCTOBER 5, 2018. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on 9/04/2018. (lcckk3) (Entered: 09/04/2018)
2018-09-04Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 10/5/2018, updating the Court on the status of Defendants' processing of Plaintiff's FOIA request. (dot) (Entered: 09/06/2018)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar