Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleFIGUEROA v. DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE et al
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2018cv01393
Date Filed2018-06-13
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Dabney L. Friedrich
PlaintiffANTONIO FIGUEROA
Case DescriptionAntonio Figueroa submitted a FOIA request to the Department of the Air Force for records from the Puerto Rico National Guard. After hearing nothing further from the agency, Figueroa filed an administrative appeal. After hearing nothing further, he filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantDEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE
DefendantDEPARTMENT OF THE AIR FORCE
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
Complaint attachment 6
Complaint attachment 7
Complaint attachment 8
Complaint attachment 9
Complaint attachment 10
Complaint attachment 11
Complaint attachment 12
Complaint attachment 13
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2018-06-131COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-5531747) filed by Antonio Figueroa. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit FOIA Request, # 2 Exhibit Postal Receipt, # 3 Exhibit FOIA Appeal, # 4 Exhibit Appeal Response, # 5 Exhibit Privacy Appeal, # 6 Exhibit FOIA Appeal Higher, # 7 Exhibit FOIA Response Final, # 8 Exhibit PRNG Acknowledgement, # 9 Civil Cover Sheet, # 10 Civil Cover Sheet Related Case Form, # 11 Summons Air force, # 12 Summons Attorney General, # 13 Summons Dod)(Manne, Jason) (Entered: 06/13/2018)
2018-06-132ERRATA (Redacting SSN from Exhibit) by Antonio Figueroa 1 Complaint,, filed by Antonio Figueroa. (Manne, Jason) (Entered: 06/13/2018)
2018-06-13Case Assigned to Judge Dabney L. Friedrich. (zsth) (Entered: 06/13/2018)
2018-06-133NOTICE OF RELATED CASE by ANTONIO FIGUEROA. Case related to Case No. 17-cv-1713. (zsth) (Entered: 06/13/2018)
2018-06-134REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO ISSUE to US Attorney for District of Columbia re 1 Complaint,, filed by ANTONIO FIGUEROA. Related document: 1 Complaint,, filed by ANTONIO FIGUEROA.(Manne, Jason) (Entered: 06/13/2018)
2018-06-135REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO ISSUE (Corrected FOIA Summons) re 1 Complaint,, filed by ANTONIO FIGUEROA. Related document: 1 Complaint,, filed by ANTONIO FIGUEROA. (Attachments: # 1 Summons, # 2 Summons, # 3 Summons)(Manne, Jason) (Entered: 06/13/2018)
2018-06-186SUMMONS (4) Issued Electronically as to DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE, DEPARTMENT OF THE AIR FORCE, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (jf) (Additional attachment(s) added on 6/18/2018: # 1 Consent Form) (zjf). (Entered: 06/18/2018)
2018-08-107AMENDED COMPLAINT against DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE, DEPARTMENT OF THE AIR FORCE filed by ANTONIO FIGUEROA. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit Exhibit H, # 9 Exhibit Exhibit I, # 10 Exhibit Exhibit J, # 11 Exhibit Exhibit K, # 12 Exhibit Exhibit L)(Manne, Jason) (Entered: 08/10/2018)
2018-08-108RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 7/23/2018. ( Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 8/22/2018.), RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 07/23/2018., RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE served on 7/23/2018; DEPARTMENT OF THE AIR FORCE served on 7/23/2018 (Manne, Jason) (Entered: 08/10/2018)
2018-08-229Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 7 Amended Complaint, by DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE, DEPARTMENT OF THE AIR FORCE (Haynes, Fred) (Entered: 08/22/2018)
2018-08-23MINUTE ORDER granting the defendant's 9 Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer. It is ORDERED that the defendant shall file its answer on or before August 24, 2018. Signed by Judge Dabney L. Friedrich on August 23, 2018. (lcdlf2) (Entered: 08/23/2018)
2018-08-2410ANSWER to 7 Amended Complaint, by DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE, DEPARTMENT OF THE AIR FORCE.(Haynes, Fred) (Entered: 08/24/2018)
2018-08-2811MINUTE ORDER requiring the parties to MEET AND CONFER and file a Joint Status Report proposing a schedule for further proceedings. The parties shall file the Joint Status Report no later than September 26, 2018. Signed by Judge Dabney L. Friedrich on August 28, 2018. (lcdlf1) (Entered: 08/28/2018)
2018-09-2612Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File the Parties' Joint Status Report by DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE, DEPARTMENT OF THE AIR FORCE (Haynes, Fred) (Entered: 09/26/2018)
2018-09-27MINUTE ORDER granting the defendant's 12 Consent Motion for One-Week Extension of Time to File Joint Status Report. Accordingly, it is ORDERED that the parties shall file a joint status report on or before October 3, 2018. Signed by Judge Dabney L. Friedrich on September 27, 2018. (lcdlf1) (Entered: 09/27/2018)
2018-09-27Set/Reset Deadlines: Status Report due by 10/3/2018. (jl) (Entered: 09/27/2018)
2018-10-0313Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File the Parties' Joint Status Report by DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE, DEPARTMENT OF THE AIR FORCE (Haynes, Fred) (Entered: 10/03/2018)
2018-10-04MINUTE ORDER granting the defendants' 13 Consent Motion for a Further One-Week Extension of Time to File Joint Status Report. Accordingly, it is ORDERED that the parties shall file a joint status report on or before October 10, 2018. Signed by Judge Dabney L. Friedrich on October 4, 2018. (lcdlf1) (Entered: 10/04/2018)
2018-10-04Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings: Status Report due by 10/10/2018. (jl) (Entered: 10/04/2018)
2018-10-1014Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File the Parties' Joint Status Report (to October 17, 2018) by DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE, DEPARTMENT OF THE AIR FORCE (Haynes, Fred) (Entered: 10/10/2018)
2018-10-11MINUTE ORDER granting the defendant's 14 Consent Motion for a Further One-Week Extension of Time to File Joint Status Report. Accordingly, it is ORDERED that the parties shall file a status report on or before October 17, 2018. Signed by Judge Dabney L. Friedrich on October 11, 2018. (lcdlf1) (Entered: 10/11/2018)
2018-10-11Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings: Status Report due by 10/17/2018. (jl) (Entered: 10/12/2018)
2018-10-1715Joint STATUS REPORT by DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE, DEPARTMENT OF THE AIR FORCE. (Haynes, Fred) (Entered: 10/17/2018)
2018-10-18MINUTE ORDER adopting the proposal in the parties' 15 Joint Status Report. Accordingly, it is ORDERED that the parties shall file another joint status report on or before December 17, 2018. Signed by Judge Dabney L. Friedrich on October 18, 2018. (lcdlf1) (Entered: 10/18/2018)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar