Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleMuhammad v. Privat et al
DistrictNorthern District of California
CitySan Francisco
Case Number3:2018cv03601
Date Filed2018-06-15
Date Closed2019-01-28
JudgeJudge James Donato
PlaintiffJames Karim Muhammad
Case DescriptionJames Muhammad requested information from Carlos Privat, an attorney for the City of Richmond, for records dating back to 1903. The city failed to respond and Muhammad filed suit. Muhammad may have a cause of action under the California Public Records Act, but not under FOIA.
Complaint issues: FOIA not mentioned

DefendantCarlos A. Privat
DefendantCity of Richmond
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
Opinion/Order [25]
Opinion/Order [30]
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2018-06-151VERIFIED COMPLAINT FOR UNDER COLOR OF CALIFORNIA LAW CONSPIRACY TO CONCEAL PUBLIC RECORDS FROM PLAINTIFF; DECLARATORY JUDGMENT; CIVIL AND PUNITIVE DAMAGES TRIAL DEMANDED; (NO PROCESS); (IFP PENDING); against City of Richmond, Carlos A. Privat Filed byJames Karim Muhammad. Consent/Declination due by 6/29/2018. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Civil Cover Sheet)(cpS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/15/2018) Modified on 6/19/2018 (aaaS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 06/18/2018)
2018-06-152MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by James Karim Muhammad. (cpS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/15/2018) (Entered: 06/18/2018)
2018-06-153Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 9/11/2018. Initial Case Management Conference set for 9/18/2018 03:00 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom E, 15th Floor. (Attachments: # 1 Standing Order, # 2 Standing Order for All Judges)(cpS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/15/2018) (Entered: 06/18/2018)
2018-06-185CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge; by James Karim Muhammad. (aaaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/18/2018) (Entered: 06/20/2018)
2018-06-186FIRST AMENDED VERIFIED COMPLAINT FOR UNDER COLOR OF CALIFORNIA LAW CONSPIRACY TO CONCEAL PUBLIC RECORDS FROM PLAINTIFF; DECLARATORY JUDGMENT; CIVIL AND PUNITIVE DAMAGES TRIAL DEMANDED; against City of Richmond, Carlos A. Privat. Filed byJames Karim Muhammad. (aaaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/18/2018) (Entered: 06/20/2018)
2018-06-204CLERK'S NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF Re: Consent or Declination. Plaintiff shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. Consent/Declination due by 7/5/2018. The deputy clerk hereby certifies that on 6/20/2018 a copy of this order was served by sending it via first-class mail to the address of each non-CM/ECF user listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing. (shyS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/20/2018) (Entered: 06/20/2018)
2018-06-287ORDER Re Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte: granting 2 Application. The deputy clerk hereby certifies that on 6/28/2018 a copy of this order was served by sending it via first-class mail to the address of each non-CM/ECF user listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing. (shyS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/28/2018) Modified on 6/28/2018 (shyS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 06/28/2018)
2018-07-268Letter dated 07/26/18; from James K. Muhammad re Challenge. (aaaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/26/2018) (Entered: 07/27/2018)
2018-07-319FIRST AMENDED DECLARATION OF JAMES KARIM MUHAMMAD AND OBJECTION TO ELIZABETH D. LAPORTE AS JUDGE OVER PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT, BECAUSE OF PREJUDICE; filed byJames Karim Muhammad. (aaaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/31/2018) (Entered: 08/01/2018)
2018-08-0810MOTION FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS AND FOR SERVICE BY U.S. MARSHAL; filed by James Karim Muhammad. Responses due by 8/22/2018. Replies due by 8/29/2018. (aaaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/8/2018) (Entered: 08/10/2018)
2018-08-2411USCA Case Number 18-72350 (aaaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/24/2018) (Entered: 08/24/2018)
2018-11-0812ORDER of USCA (ddkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/8/2018) (Entered: 11/21/2018)
2018-12-0613REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis; Order Reassigning Case by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte. Objections due by 12/20/2018. The deputy clerk hereby certifies that on 12/6/2018 a copy of this order was served by sending it via first-class mail to the address of each non-CM/ECF user listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing. (shyS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/6/2018) Modified on 12/6/2018 (shyS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 12/06/2018)
2018-12-1014ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge James Donato for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte no longer assigned to the case. This case is assigned to a judge who participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Signed by the Executive Committee on 12/10/18. (Attachments: # 1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(srnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/10/2018) (Entered: 12/10/2018)
2018-12-1115CASE MANAGEMENT SCHEDULING ORDER: Initial Case Management Conference set for 1/31/2019 10:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 11, 19th Floor. Case Management Statement due by 1/24/2019. Signed by Judge James Donato on 12/11/18. (lrcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/11/2018) (Entered: 12/11/2018)
2019-01-0216MOTION FOR ORDER ISSUING AND SEVICE OF SUMMONS AND FOR ORDER DIRECTING SERVICE BY US MARSHAL filed by James Karim Muhammad. Responses due by 1/16/2019. Replies due by 1/23/2019. (ddkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/2/2019) (Entered: 01/04/2019)
2019-01-2817ORDER by Judge James Donato adopting Report and Recommendations 13 Report and Recommendations.. (lrcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/28/2019) (Additional attachment(s) added on 1/28/2019: # 1 Certificate/Proof of Service) (lrcS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 01/28/2019)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar