Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleSTOTTER & ASSOCIATES LLC v. UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2018cv01528
Date Filed2018-06-26
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Randolph D. Moss
PlaintiffSTOTTER & ASSOCIATES LLC
Case DescriptionThe law firm of Stotter & Associates submitted a FOIA request to the Department of Justice for records concerning contracts awarded to Advance Technologies Group. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request. Stotter & Associates narrowed its request to three specific contracts. The agency told the law firm that processing the contracts could take up to 12 months. After hearing nothing further from the agency, Stotter & Associates filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Adequacy - Search, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantUNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2018-06-261COMPLAINT against UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-5556934) filed by STOTTER & ASSOCIATES LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Stotter, Daniel) (Entered: 06/26/2018)
2018-06-272REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO ISSUE (3) filed by STOTTER & ASSOCIATES LLC.(Stotter, Daniel) (Entered: 06/27/2018)
2018-06-27Case Assigned to Judge Randolph D. Moss. (zsb) (Entered: 06/27/2018)
2018-06-273SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zsb) (Entered: 06/27/2018)
2018-06-284STANDING ORDER: The parties are hereby ORDERED to comply with the directives set forth in this Court's Standing Order. See document for details. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 6/28/18. (lcrdm3, ) (Entered: 06/28/2018)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff