Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleDEFRAIA v. DEFENSE HEALTH AGENCY
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2018cv01538
Date Filed2018-06-27
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Dabney L. Friedrich
PlaintiffDANIEL CHARLES DEFRAIA
Case DescriptionDaniel DeFraia submitted a FOIA request to the Defense Health Agency for records concerning the data and methodology used in a study conducted by the Defense Center of Excellence regarding Comprehensive Soldier Fitness, Comprehensive Soldier and Family Fitness, and Comprehensive Airman Fitness. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request. After a number of attempts to check the status of his request were unsuccessful, DeFraia filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Adequacy - Search, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantDEFENSE HEALTH AGENCY
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2018-06-271COMPLAINT against DEFENSE HEALTH AGENCY ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-5559628) filed by DANIEL CHARLES DeFRAIA. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Stotter, Daniel) (Entered: 06/27/2018)
2018-06-272REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO ISSUE (3) filed by DANIEL CHARLES DeFRAIA.(Stotter, Daniel) (Entered: 06/27/2018)
2018-06-29Case Assigned to Judge Dabney L. Friedrich. (zsb) (Entered: 06/29/2018)
2018-06-293SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to DEFENSE HEALTH AGENCY, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zsb) (Entered: 06/29/2018)
2018-07-104NOTICE of Appearance by Rhonda Lisa Campbell on behalf of DEFENSE HEALTH AGENCY (Campbell, Rhonda) (Entered: 07/10/2018)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff