Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleGaravaglia et al v. United States of America - Internal Revenue Service
DistrictEastern District of Michigan
CityDetroit
Case Number2:2018cv12061
Date Filed2018-07-02
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeDistrict Judge Terrence G. Berg
PlaintiffCharles L. Garavaglia
PlaintiffMary Ann Garavaglia
Case DescriptionCharles and Mary Ann Garavaglia submitted a FOIA request to the IRS for records concerning its tax investigation of them. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request and told the Garavaglias that it would be unable to respond within the statutory time limit. After hearing nothing further from the agency, the Garavaglias filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantUnited States of America - Internal Revenue Service
Documents
Docket
Complaint
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2018-07-021COMPLAINT filed by All Plaintiffs against United States of America - Internal Revenue Service with Jury Demand. Plaintiff requests summons issued. Receipt No: 0645-6799594 - Fee: $ 400. County of 1st Plaintiff: Oakland - County Where Action Arose: Oakland - County of 1st Defendant: USA. [ Previously dismissed case: No] [ Possible companion case(s): None ] (Abraham, Jerry) (Entered: 07/02/2018)
2018-07-02A United States Magistrate Judge of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form is available for download at http://www.mied.uscourts.gov (DPer) (Entered: 07/02/2018)
2018-07-022SUMMONS Issued for *United States of America - Internal Revenue Service* (DPer) (Entered: 07/02/2018)
2018-07-023SUMMONS Issued for the United States Attorney and the Office of the Attorney General. (DPer) (Entered: 07/02/2018)
2018-07-124NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel W. Weininger on behalf of All Plaintiffs. (Weininger, Daniel) (Entered: 07/12/2018)
2018-09-105ANSWER to Complaint with Affirmative Defenses by United States of America - Internal Revenue Service. (Banerjee, Carmen) (Entered: 09/10/2018)
2018-09-126NOTICE TO APPEAR BY TELEPHONE: Scheduling Conference set for 9/24/2018 10:00 AM before District Judge Terrence G. Berg (AChu) (Entered: 09/12/2018)
2018-09-12Set Deadlines/Hearings: TELEPHONIC Scheduling Conference RESET for 9/26/2018 10:00 AM before District Judge Terrence G. Berg (AChu) (Entered: 09/12/2018)
2018-09-187NOTICE of Appearance by Erin Darden on behalf of United States of America - Internal Revenue Service. (Darden, Erin) (Entered: 09/18/2018)
2018-09-21Set Deadlines/Hearings: TELEPHONIC Scheduling Conference set for 9/26/2018 04:30 PM before District Judge Terrence G. Berg (AChu) (Entered: 09/21/2018)
2018-09-21Set Deadlines/Hearings: TELEPHONIC Scheduling Conference set for 9/27/2018 04:30 PM before District Judge Terrence G. Berg (AChu) (Entered: 09/21/2018)
2018-09-278[DOCUMENT TITLED: "JOINT STATUS REPORT"] DISCOVERY plan jointly filed pursuant to Federal Rules of Civil Procedure 26(f) (Weininger, Daniel) Modified on 9/27/2018 (LGra). Modified on 9/27/2018 (LGra). (Entered: 09/27/2018)
2018-10-039NOTICE of Appearance by Stephanie Sasarak on behalf of United States of America - Internal Revenue Service. (Sasarak, Stephanie) (Entered: 10/03/2018)
2018-11-2710STATUS REPORT by United States of America - Internal Revenue Service (Darden, Erin) (Entered: 11/27/2018)
2018-12-10Set Deadlines/Hearings: Status Report due by 2/1/2019 (AChu) (Entered: 12/10/2018)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar