Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleOsen LLC v. United States Department of State
DistrictSouthern District of New York
CityFoley Square
Case Number1:2018cv06070
Date Filed2018-07-03
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Jed S. Rakoff
PlaintiffOsen LLC
Case DescriptionOsen, LLC, a law firm representing service members and the families of service members killed in Iraq and Afghanistan by Iranian-backed terrorists, submitted FOIA requests to Department of State for records concerning cables from the U.S. Embassy in Baghdad. The agency acknowledged receipt of the requests, but after hearing nothing further from the agency, Osen LLC filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantUnited States Department of State
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2018-07-031FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - SIGNATURE ERROR - COMPLAINT against United States Department of State. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number 0208-15283940)Document filed by Osen LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C)(Friedman, William) Modified on 7/5/2018 (pc). (Entered: 07/03/2018)
2018-07-032CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Friedman, William) (Entered: 07/03/2018)
2018-07-033RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Osen LLC.(Friedman, William) (Entered: 07/03/2018)
2018-07-034FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - SUMMONS REQUEST PDF ERROR - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to U.S. Dept. of State, re: 1 Complaint. Document filed by Osen LLC. (Friedman, William) Modified on 7/5/2018 (pc). (Entered: 07/03/2018)
2018-07-05***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT PLEADING. Notice to Attorney William Adam Friedman to RE-FILE Document No. 1 Complaint. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the pleading was not signed by the attorney who filed it. Re-file the pleading using the event type Complaint found under the event list Complaints and Other Initiating Documents - attach the correct signed PDF - select the individually named filer/filers - select the individually named party/parties the pleading is against. (pc) (Entered: 07/05/2018)
2018-07-05CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Jed S. Rakoff. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php . (pc) (Entered: 07/05/2018)
2018-07-05Magistrate Judge Debra C. Freeman is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php . (pc) (Entered: 07/05/2018)
2018-07-05Case Designated ECF. (pc) (Entered: 07/05/2018)
2018-07-05***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS. Notice to Attorney William Adam Friedman to RE-FILE Document No. 4 Request for Issuance of Summons,. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): Party name on summons must exactly match what is listed on the caption title. Re-file the document using the event type Request for Issuance of Summons found under the event list Service of Process - select the correct filer/filers - and attach the correct summons form PDF. (pc) (Entered: 07/05/2018)
2018-07-055REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to United States Department of State, re: 1 Complaint,. Document filed by Osen LLC. (Friedman, William) (Entered: 07/05/2018)
2018-07-056NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Michael Jacob Radine on behalf of Osen LLC. (Radine, Michael) (Entered: 07/05/2018)
2018-07-057COMPLAINT against United States Department of State. Document filed by Osen LLC.(Radine, Michael) (Entered: 07/05/2018)
2018-07-138ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to United States Department of State. (pne) (Entered: 07/13/2018)
2018-07-139NOTICE OF COURT CONFERENCE: Initial Conference set for 7/30/2018 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom 14B, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Jed S. Rakoff, as further set forth in this order. (Signed by Judge Jed S. Rakoff on 7/13/2018) (jwh) (Entered: 07/13/2018)
2018-07-30Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Jed S. Rakoff: Initial Pretrial Conference held on 7/30/2018. (Kotowski, Linda) (Entered: 07/30/2018)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar