Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleWALLICK v. AGRICULTURAL MARKETING SERVICE
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2018cv01627
Date Filed2018-07-10
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Christopher R. Cooper
PlaintiffRICHARD S. WALLICK
Case DescriptionRichard Wallick submitted a FOIA request to the Agricultural Marketing Service for records concerning the role of Material Review Organizations in the agency's National Organic Program. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request. The agency sent Wallick an interim response. Wallick asked the agency if he could postpone his administrative appeal until the agency finished processing his request. The agency agreed. The agency later sent its final response and Wallick filed an administrative appeal. After hearing nothing further from the agency, Wallick filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantAGRICULTURAL MARKETING SERVICE
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2018-07-101COMPLAINT against AGRICULTURAL MARKETING SERVICE ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-5580485) filed by RICHARD S. WALLICK. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Stotter, Daniel) (Entered: 07/10/2018)
2018-07-102REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO ISSUE (3) filed by RICHARD S. WALLICK.(Stotter, Daniel) (Entered: 07/10/2018)
2018-07-10Case Assigned to Judge Christopher R. Cooper. (zmd) (Entered: 07/12/2018)
2018-07-123SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to AGRICULTURAL MARKETING SERVICE, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: # 1 Notice and Consent) (zmd) (Entered: 07/12/2018)
2018-07-244NOTICE of Appearance by Damon William Taaffe on behalf of AGRICULTURAL MARKETING SERVICE (Taaffe, Damon) (Entered: 07/24/2018)
2018-08-065NOTICE of Appearance by C. Peter Sorenson on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Sorenson, C.) (Entered: 08/06/2018)
2018-08-176ANSWER to Complaint by AGRICULTURAL MARKETING SERVICE.(Taaffe, Damon) (Entered: 08/17/2018)
2018-08-17MINUTE ORDER: Before the Court in this FOIA case are a complaint and an answer. Since the requirements of LCvR 16.3 and Rule 26(f) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure do not apply, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall confer and file a joint proposed schedule for briefing or disclosure by September 4, 2018. Signed by Judge Christopher R. Cooper on 8/17/2018. (lccrc2) (Entered: 08/17/2018)
2018-08-20Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Proposed Briefing Schedule due by 9/4/2018 (lsj) (Entered: 08/20/2018)
2018-09-047Joint STATUS REPORT and Motion for Briefing Schedule by AGRICULTURAL MARKETING SERVICE. (Taaffe, Damon) (Entered: 09/04/2018)
2018-09-04VACATED PURSUANT TO MINUTE ORDER ENTERED 10/29/2018.....MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of the parties' 7 Joint Proposed Briefing Schedule, it is hereby ORDERED: Defendant's motion for summary judgment is due on or before October 31, 2018; Plaintiff's combined cross-motion for summary judgment and opposition is due on or before November 30, 2018; Defendant's combined opposition and reply is due on or before January 4, 2019; and Plaintiff's reply is due on or before January 28, 2019. Signed by Judge Christopher R. Cooper on 9/4/2018. (lccrc2) Modified on 10/30/2018 (zlsj). (Entered: 09/04/2018)
2018-09-04Set/Reset Deadlines: Summary Judgment motions due by 10/31/2018. Response to Motion for Summary Judgment due by 11/30/2018. Reply to Motion for Summary Judgment due by 1/4/2019. Replies due by 1/28/2019. (lsj) (Entered: 09/04/2018)
2018-09-048Joint MOTION for Briefing Schedule by AGRICULTURAL MARKETING SERVICE, RICHARD S. WALLICK (See Docket Entry 7 to view document). (znmw) (Entered: 09/06/2018)
2018-10-259NOTICE of Appearance by C. Peter Sorenson on behalf of RICHARD S. WALLICK (Sorenson, C.) (Entered: 10/25/2018)
2018-10-2910Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Motion for Summary Judgment by AGRICULTURAL MARKETING SERVICE (Taaffe, Damon) (Entered: 10/29/2018)
2018-10-29MINUTE ORDER: The Defendant's 10 motion for extension of time to file its motion for summary judgment is granted. The Court's prior order on September 4, 2018, setting a briefing schedule is hereby vacated and the following briefing schedule shall apply: Defendant's motion for summary judgment is due on or before November 7, 2018; Plaintiff's combined opposition and cross-motion for summary judgment is due on or before December 7, 2018; Defendant's combined opposition and reply is due on or before January 11, 2019; and plaintiff's reply is due on or before February 4, 2019. Signed by Judge Christopher R. Cooper on 10/29/2018. (lccrc2) (Entered: 10/29/2018)
2018-10-30Set/Reset Deadlines: Summary Judgment motions due by 11/7/2018. Response to Motion for Summary Judgment due by 12/7/2018. Reply to Motion for Summary Judgment due by 1/11/2019. Plaintiff's Reply due by 2/4/2019. (lsj) (Entered: 10/30/2018)
2018-11-0511Joint MOTION to Stay re 7 Status Report, Set/Reset Deadlines by AGRICULTURAL MARKETING SERVICE (Taaffe, Damon) (Entered: 11/05/2018)
2018-12-0312Joint STATUS REPORT & Proposed Order by RICHARD S. WALLICK. (Stotter, Daniel) (Entered: 12/03/2018)
2018-12-03MINUTE ORDER granting 11 Motion to Stay the Briefing Schedule. The briefing schedule will be stayed until January 11, 2019, as the parties continue to discuss an informal resolution to the case. Should the parties be unable to reach an agreement by that date, the parties should propose a briefing schedule for any issues that remain. Signed by Judge Christopher R. Cooper on 12/3/2018. (lccrc2) (Entered: 12/03/2018)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar