Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleINSTITUTE FOR ENERGY RESEARCH v. UNITED STATES TREASURY DEPARTMENT
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2018cv01677
Date Filed2018-07-17
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Carl J. Nichols
PlaintiffINSTITUTE FOR ENERGY RESEARCH
Case DescriptionThe Institute for Energy Research submitted a FOIA request to the Department of the Treasury for communications sent to or from Peter Wisner, the Director of the Office of Environment & Energy related to climate change. The Institute for Energy Research also requested a fee waiver or inclusion in the news media fee category. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request, but told the Institute for Energy Research that it would not rule on its fee waiver request until it determined whether the cost of the records would exceed $25. The Institute for Energy Research then filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Public Interest Fee Waiver, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantUNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF THE TREASURY
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2018-07-171COMPLAINT against UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF THE TREASURY (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-5590611) filed by INSTITUTE FOR ENERGY RESEARCH. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Horner, Christopher) (Attachment 1 replaced on 7/18/2018) (zmd). (Entered: 07/17/2018)
2018-07-172LCvR 7.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by INSTITUTE FOR ENERGY RESEARCH (Horner, Christopher) (Entered: 07/17/2018)
2018-07-173NOTICE OF CONSENT AND REFERENCE OF A CIVIL ACTION TO A MAGISTRATE JUDGE by INSTITUTE FOR ENERGY RESEARCH (Horner, Christopher) (Entered: 07/17/2018)
2018-07-174NOTICE of Appearance by Jason T. Miller on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Miller, Jason) (Entered: 07/17/2018)
2018-07-17Case Assigned to Judge Rudolph Contreras. (zmd) (Entered: 07/18/2018)
2018-07-185REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO ISSUE Treasury, USAG, USAtty for DC filed by INSTITUTE FOR ENERGY RESEARCH. (Attachments: # 1 Summons Summons for US Attorney General, # 2 Summons Summons for US Atty for DC)(Horner, Christopher) (Entered: 07/18/2018)
2018-07-186SUMMONS (1) Issued Electronically as to UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF THE TREASURY. (zsb) (Entered: 07/18/2018)
2018-07-257REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO ISSUE to ATTORNEY GENERAL and US ATTORNEY re 6 Summons Issued Electronically filed by INSTITUTE FOR ENERGY RESEARCH. Related document: 6 Summons Issued Electronically. (Attachments: # 1 Summons Summons to US Attorney for DC)(Horner, Christopher) (Entered: 07/25/2018)
2018-07-278SUMMONS (2) Issued Electronically as to, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (jf) (Entered: 07/27/2018)
2018-08-099RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 8/3/2018. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 9/2/2018. (Miller, Jason) (Entered: 08/09/2018)
2018-08-0910RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 08/03/2018. (Miller, Jason) (Entered: 08/09/2018)
2018-08-2411RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF THE TREASURY served on 8/3/2018 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Exhibit)(Miller, Jason) (Entered: 08/24/2018)
2018-09-0412ANSWER to Complaint by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF THE TREASURY.(Peterson, Benton) (Entered: 09/04/2018)
2018-09-07MINUTE ORDER: It is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall meet, confer, and jointly submit a proposed briefing schedule by September 21, 2018. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on September 7, 2018. (lcrc2) (Entered: 09/07/2018)
2018-09-12Set/Reset Deadlines: Proposed Briefing Schedule due by 9/21/2018 (tj) (Entered: 09/12/2018)
2018-09-2113Joint STATUS REPORT Filed on behalf of both parties by INSTITUTE FOR ENERGY RESEARCH. (Horner, Christopher) (Entered: 09/21/2018)
2018-09-21MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of 13 the parties' Joint Status Report, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall submit another joint status report by October 23, 2018. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on September 21, 2018. (lcrc2) (Entered: 09/21/2018)
2018-09-25Set/Reset Deadlines: Status Report due by 10/23/2018 (tj) (Entered: 09/25/2018)
2018-10-2314Joint STATUS REPORT filed on behalf of both parties by INSTITUTE FOR ENERGY RESEARCH. (Horner, Christopher) (Entered: 10/23/2018)
2018-10-24MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of 14 the parties' Joint Status Report, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall file another joint status report by November 27, 2018. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 10/24/2018. (lcrc2) (Entered: 10/24/2018)
2018-10-26Set/Reset Deadlines: Status Report due by 11/27/2018 (tj) (Entered: 10/26/2018)
2018-11-2715Joint STATUS REPORT filed on behalf of both parties by INSTITUTE FOR ENERGY RESEARCH. (Horner, Christopher) (Entered: 11/27/2018)
2018-11-27MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of 15 the parties' Joint Status Report, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall file another joint status report by January 25, 2019. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on November 27, 2018. (lcrc2) (Entered: 11/27/2018)
2018-11-30Set/Reset Deadlines: Status Report due by 1/25/2019 (tj) (Entered: 11/30/2018)
2019-01-2216Consent MOTION to Stay , MOTION for Extension of Time to in Light of Lapse of Appropriations by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF THE TREASURY (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Hudak, Brian) (Entered: 01/22/2019)
2019-01-23MINUTE ORDER granting 16 Motion to Stay: It is hereby ORDERED that this case is STAYED until appropriations are restored to the Department of Justice and the Department of Treasury. The joint status report currently due on January 25, 2019 shall now be filed within fourteen days of appropriations being restored to the above noted agencies. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on January 23, 2019. (lcrc2) (Entered: 01/23/2019)
2019-02-0817Joint STATUS REPORT by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF THE TREASURY. (Peterson, Benton) (Entered: 02/08/2019)
2019-02-11MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of 17 the parties' Joint Status Report, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties will file another joint status report by March 11, 2019. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on February 11, 2019. (lcrc2) (Entered: 02/11/2019)
2019-03-01Set/Reset Deadlines: Status Report due by 3/11/2019 (tj) (Entered: 03/01/2019)
2019-03-1118Joint STATUS REPORT by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF THE TREASURY. (Hair, Christopher) (Entered: 03/11/2019)
2019-03-11MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of 18 the parties' Joint Status Report, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall file another joint status report by May 10, 2019, and then additional joint status reports every 60 days after that until production is complete. Within 14 days of production being completed, the parties shall file a joint status report that includes a proposal for how to govern further proceedings. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on March 11, 2019. (lcrc2) (Entered: 03/11/2019)
2019-04-04Set/Reset Deadlines: Status Report due by 5/10/2019 (tj) (Entered: 04/04/2019)
2019-05-1019Joint STATUS REPORT by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF THE TREASURY. (Hair, Christopher) (Entered: 05/10/2019)
2019-05-1320NOTICE OF SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL by Christopher Charles Hair on behalf of UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF THE TREASURY Substituting for attorney Benton Peterson (Hair, Christopher) (Entered: 05/13/2019)
2019-06-26Case directly reassigned to Judge Carl J. Nichols. Judge Rudolph Contreras is no longer assigned to the case. (rj) (Entered: 06/26/2019)
2019-07-0921Joint STATUS REPORT by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF THE TREASURY. (Hair, Christopher) (Entered: 07/09/2019)
2019-09-0922Joint STATUS REPORT by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF THE TREASURY. (Hair, Christopher) (Entered: 09/09/2019)
2019-09-11MINUTE ORDER. In light of the Parties' 22 Joint Status Report, and consistent with the Court's March 11, 2019 Order, it is hereby ORDERED that the Parties shall submit an additional Joint Status Report on or before November 8, 2019. Signed by Judge Carl J. Nichols on September 11, 2019. (lccjn3) (Entered: 09/11/2019)
2019-09-11Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings: Joint Status Report due by 11/8/2019. (zcdw) (Entered: 09/12/2019)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar