Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleAna Muniz v. The United States Department of Homeland Security
DistrictCentral District of California
CityWestern Division - Los Angeles
Case Number2:2018cv06224
Date Filed2018-07-18
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Christina A. Snyder
PlaintiffAna Muniz
Case DescriptionAna Muniz, a professor of criminology at the University of California-Irvine, submitted a FOIA request to U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services for records concerning individuals who had been removed, deemed removable, or had their status adjusted because of gang affiliation. The agency acknowledged receipt of her request, but after hearing nothing further from the agency, Muniz filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantThe United States Department of Homeland Security
Documents
Docket
Complaint
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2018-07-181COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-22109950 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiff Ana Muniz. (Attorney Matthew D Strugar added to party Ana Muniz(pty:pla))(Strugar, Matthew) (Entered: 07/18/2018)
2018-07-182CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Ana Muniz. (Strugar, Matthew) (Entered: 07/18/2018)
2018-07-183Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) 1 filed by Plaintiff Ana Muniz. (Strugar, Matthew) (Entered: 07/18/2018)
2018-07-194NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Christina A. Snyder and Magistrate Judge John E. McDermott. (et) (Entered: 07/19/2018)
2018-07-195NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (et) (Entered: 07/19/2018)
2018-07-196NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Request to Issue Summons RE: Summons Request 3 . The following error(s) was found: The caption of the summons must match the caption of the complaint verbatim. If the caption is too large to fit in the space provided, enter the name of the first party and then write see attached.Next, attach a face page of the complaint or a second page addendum to the Summons. The summons cannot be issued until this defect has been corrected. Please correct the defect and re-file your request. (et) (Entered: 07/19/2018)
2018-07-197NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Attorney Case Opening RE: Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) 1 . The following error(s) was found: No Notice of Interested Parties has been filed. A Notice of Interested Parties must be filed with every partys first appearance. See Local Rule 7.1-1. Counsel must file a Notice of Interested Parties immediately. Failure to do so may be addressed by judicial action, including sanctions. See Local Rule 83-7. (et) (Entered: 07/19/2018)
2018-07-198Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) 1 filed by Plaintiff Ana Muniz. (Strugar, Matthew) (Entered: 07/19/2018)
2018-07-199NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by plaintiff Ana Muniz, (Strugar, Matthew) (Entered: 07/19/2018)
2018-07-191030 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) 1 as to Defendant The United States Department of Homeland Security. (et) (Entered: 07/19/2018)
2018-08-2211STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to The United States Department of Homeland Security answer now due 9/24/2018, re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) 1 filed by Defendant The United States Department of Homeland Security.(Attorney Alarice M Medrano added to party The United States Department of Homeland Security(pty:dft))(Medrano, Alarice) (Entered: 08/22/2018)
2018-08-2712NOTICE TO COUNSEL upon filing of the complaint by Judge Christina A. Snyder. (rba) (Entered: 08/27/2018)
2018-09-1213Second STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to The United States Department of Homeland Security answer now due 10/24/2018, re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) 1 filed by Defendant The United States Department of Homeland Security. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Attorney Matthew Jimenez Barragan added to party The United States Department of Homeland Security(pty:dft))(Barragan, Matthew) (Entered: 09/12/2018)
2018-09-1214ORDER EXTENDING TIME FOR DEFENDANT TO RESPOND TO INITIAL COMPLAINT TO OCTOBER 24, 2018 13 by Judge Christina A. Snyder (lc) (Entered: 09/12/2018)
2018-10-2415ANSWER to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) 1 filed by Defendant The United States Department of Homeland Security.(Medrano, Alarice) (Entered: 10/24/2018)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar