Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleAmerica CV Network, LLC v. U.S. Department of the Treasure, Office of Foreign Assets Control
DistrictSouthern District of Florida
CityMiami
Case Number1:2018cv22862
Date Filed2018-07-16
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Cecilia M. Altonaga
PlaintiffAmerica CV Network, LLC
Case DescriptionThe America CV Network submitted a FOIA request to the Department of the Treasury's Office of Foreign Assets Control for records concerning restrictions put on bank accounts related to Juan Arrondo or Peer Music. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request and asked for a third-party authorization to release records concerning Arrondo. The America CV Network provided a copy of Arrondo's death certificate. After hearing nothing further from the agency, the America CV Network filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantU.S. Department of the Treasure, Office of Foreign Assets Control
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
Complaint attachment 6
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2018-07-161COMPLAINT against All Defendants. Filing fees $ 400.00. USA Filer - No Filing Fee Required, filed by America CV Network, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Civil Cover Sheet, # 5 Summon(s), # 6 Summon(s))(Ortega, Omar) (Entered: 07/16/2018)
2018-07-162Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Jonathan Goodman is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. (dj) (Entered: 07/17/2018)
2018-07-173Summons Issued as to U.S. Department of the Treasure, Office of Foreign Assets Control. (dj) (Entered: 07/17/2018)
2018-08-154ORDER requiring service to be perfected by 10/14/2018. Signed by Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga on 8/15/2018. See attached document for full details. (ps1) (Entered: 08/15/2018)
2018-08-215Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer as to 1 Complaint, by U.S. Department of the Treasure, Office of Foreign Assets Control. Attorney Carlos Javier Raurell added to party U.S. Department of the Treasure, Office of Foreign Assets Control(pty:dft). (Raurell, Carlos) (Entered: 08/21/2018)
2018-08-216ORDER granting in part 5 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Answer to 1 Complaint, filed by America CV Network, LLC. Defendant shall respond to the Complaint on or before September 14, 2018. This deadline will not be extended. Signed by Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga on 8/21/2018. See attached document for full details. (wc) (Entered: 08/21/2018)
2018-08-217Order Requiring Joint Scheduling Report and Certificates of Interested Parties. Joint Scheduling Report and Certificates of Interested Parties due by 9/7/2018. Signed by Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga on 8/21/2018. See attached document for full details. (wc) (Entered: 08/21/2018)
2018-08-318NOTICE by America CV Network, LLC re 4 Order, Set/Reset Deadlines Notice of Filing Return of Service on US Department of Treasury (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 - Proof of Service, # 2 Exhibit A - Signed Return receipt) (Ortega, Omar) (Entered: 08/31/2018)
2018-08-319NOTICE by America CV Network, LLC re 4 Order, Set/Reset Deadlines Notice of Filing Return of Service on Office of United States Attorney (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 - Proof of Service, # 2 Exhibit A - Signed Return receipt) (Ortega, Omar) (Entered: 08/31/2018)
2018-08-3110SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed by America CV Network, LLC. U.S. Attorney served on 7/24/2018, answer due 9/24/2018. See DE [9-2] for image. (kpe) (Entered: 09/04/2018)
2018-09-0411Clerks Notice to Filer re 9 Notice (Other),. Wrong Event Selected ; ERROR - The Filer selected the wrong event. The document was re-docketed by the Clerk, see 10 Summons Returned Executed as to U.S. Attorney. It is not necessary to refile this document. (kpe) (Entered: 09/04/2018)
2018-09-0712Certificate of Interested Parties/Corporate Disclosure Statement - NONE disclosed by U.S. Department of the Treasure, Office of Foreign Assets Control (Raurell, Carlos) (Entered: 09/07/2018)
2018-09-0713Joint SCHEDULING REPORT - Rule 26(f) by America CV Network, LLC (Ortega, Omar) (Entered: 09/07/2018)
2018-09-0714Certificate of Interested Parties by America CV Network, LLC identifying Other Affiliate Omar Ortega, Other Affiliate Office of U.S. States Attorney, Other Affiliate Peer Music, Other Affiliate Ariel Arrondo, Other Affiliate Marcell Felipe, Other Affiliate Evelyn Reyes, Other Affiliate Carlos Raurell, Other Affiliate Brent McIntosh, Other Affiliate Greenberg for America CV Network, LLC (Ortega, Omar) (Entered: 09/07/2018)
2018-09-1015ORDER SETTING TRIAL AND PRE-TRIAL SCHEDULE, REQUIRING MEDIATION, AND REFERRING CERTAIN MATTERS TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE: ( Jury Trial set for 4/15/2019 before Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga., Calendar Call set for 4/9/2019 09:00 AM before Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga.), ORDER REFERRING CASE to Mediation., ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Jonathan Goodman for Discovery Matters. Signed by Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga on 9/10/2018. See attached document for full details. (kpe) Pattern Jury Instruction Builder - To access the latest, up to date changes to the 11th Circuit Pattern Jury Instructions go to https://pji.ca11.uscourts.gov or click here. (Entered: 09/10/2018)
2018-09-1016ORDER ON MAGISTRATE JUDGE GOODMAN'S DISCOVERY PROCEDURES Signed by Magistrate Judge Jonathan Goodman on 9/10/2018. See attached document for full details. (tb) (Entered: 09/10/2018)
2018-09-1417ANSWER and Affirmative Defenses to Complaint by U.S. Department of the Treasure, Office of Foreign Assets Control. (Raurell, Carlos) (Entered: 09/14/2018)
2018-09-2118Unopposed MOTION to be Excused from Mediation Requirement re 15 Scheduling Order,,,, Order Referring Case to Mediation,,,, Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge,,, by U.S. Department of the Treasure, Office of Foreign Assets Control. (Raurell, Carlos) (Entered: 09/21/2018)
2018-09-2119ORDER granting 18 Motion for Exemption from Mediation Requirement. Signed by Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga on 9/21/2018. See attached document for full details. (ps1) (Entered: 09/21/2018)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar