Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleNaffis v. United States Department of Education
DistrictDistrict of Maryland
CityBaltimore
Case Number1:2018cv02238
Date Filed2018-07-23
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge George Jarrod Hazel
PlaintiffParviz N Naffis
Case DescriptionParviz Naffis submitted a FOIA request to the Department of Education for records concerning his student loans. The agency acknowledged receipt of his request and asked for verification of Naffis's identity. He provided that information and asked for specific records about Xerox, which was involved in Naffis's student loan. After hearing nothing further from the agency, Naffis filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Adequacy - Search, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantUnited States Department of Education
Documents
Docket
Complaint
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2018-07-231COMPLAINT FOR INJUNCTIVE RELIEF AND COST against United States Department of Education, filed by Parviz N Naffis.(Parker, Kim) (Entered: 07/23/2018)
2018-07-232-SEALED-Emergency MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Parviz N Naffis(Parker, Kim) (Entered: 07/23/2018)
2018-07-233Supplemental to 1 Complaint, 2 Emergency MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Parviz N Naffis (Summons Requested) (Attachments: # 1 Summons Pursuant to 34 C.F.R. § 4.1, # 2 Summons Pursuant to 34 C.F.R. § 4.1)(Parker, Kim) (Entered: 07/23/2018)
2018-07-234Supplemental to 1 Complaint, 3 Supplemental, 2 Emergency MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Parviz N Naffis (Civil Coversheet) (Parker, Kim) (Entered: 07/23/2018)
2018-07-235AMENDED COMPLAINT against United States Department of Education, filed by Parviz N Naffis. (Attachments: # 1 Supplement Redline Amended Complaint)(Parker, Kim) (Entered: 07/23/2018)
2018-07-236MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by Parviz N Naffis (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support, # 2 Text of Proposed Order, # 3 Exhibit A, # 4 Exhibit B, # 5 Exhibit C, # 6 Exhibit D, # 7 Exhibit E, # 8 Exhibit F, # 9 Exhibit F1, # 10 Exhibit G, # 11 Exhibit H, # 12 Exhibit I, # 13 Exhibit J, # 14 Exhibit K, # 15 Exhibit L)(Parker, Kim) (Entered: 07/23/2018)
2018-07-247NOTICE of Appearance by Sarah A Marquardt on behalf of All Defendants (Marquardt, Sarah) (Entered: 07/24/2018)
2018-07-248ORDER granting 2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis; directing the Clerk to issue summons. Signed by Judge George Jarrod Hazel on 7/24/2018. (jf3s, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 07/24/2018)
2018-07-259Summons Issued 60 days as to United States Department of Education, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: # 1 Summons, # 2 Summons)(jf3s, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 07/25/2018)
2018-08-0810SUMMONS Returned Executed by Parviz N Naffis. United States Department of Education served on 7/30/2018, answer due 9/28/2018. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)(Parker, Kim) Modified on 8/16/2018 (heps, Deputy Clerk). (Entered: 08/08/2018)
2018-09-0311MOTION for Clerk's Entry of Default for want of answer or other defense by Parviz N Naffis(Parker, Kim) (Entered: 09/03/2018)
2018-09-0312MOTION for Other Relief Motion for an immediate injunction for Defendant's Failure to Respond or Otherwise Plead In Accordance With 5 U.S.C. § 552(a)(4)(C) , MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by Parviz N Naffis (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Parker, Kim) (Entered: 09/03/2018)
2018-09-0413RESPONSE in Opposition re 6 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by United States Department of Education. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2)(Marquardt, Sarah) (Entered: 09/04/2018)
2018-09-0414MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 6 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by United States Department of Education. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Marquardt, Sarah) (Entered: 09/04/2018)
2018-09-0415RESPONSE re 12 MOTION for Other Relief Motion for an immediate injunction for Defendant's Failure to Respond or Otherwise Plead In Accordance With 5 U.S.C. § 552(a)(4)(C) MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by United States Department of Education.(Marquardt, Sarah) (Entered: 09/04/2018)
2018-09-0516MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 5 Amended Complaint by United States Department of Education. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Text of Proposed Order)(Marquardt, Sarah) (Entered: 09/05/2018)
2018-09-0617PAPERLESS ORDER granting NUNC PRO TUNC 14 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply ; granting 16 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply. Signed by Judge George Jarrod Hazel on 9/6/2018. (am2s, Chambers) (Entered: 09/06/2018)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar