Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleJUDICIAL WATCH, INC. v. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE et al
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2018cv01721
Date Filed2018-07-24
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Emmet G. Sullivan
PlaintiffJUDICIAL WATCH, INC.
Case DescriptionJudicial Watch submitted a FOIA request to the Department of State, the Department of Defense, and the Department of Homeland Security for emails containing the phrase "boycott divestment and sanctions," as well as emails containing the keywords "BDS" and "Israel." The agencies acknowledged receipt of the request. DOD told Judicial Watch that its search had found no records. Judicial Watch filed an administrative appeal with DOD, but after hearing nothing further from the agencies, Judicial Watch filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Adequacy - Search, Litigation - Vaughn index, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantU.S. DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE
DefendantU.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY
DefendantU.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
Complaint attachment 6
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2018-07-241COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-5601820) filed by JUDICIAL WATCH, INC.. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons U.S. Attorney for the District of Columbia, # 3 Summons U.S. Attorney General, # 4 Summons U.S. Department of Defense, # 5 Summons U.S. Department of Homeland Security, # 6 Summons U.S. Department of State)(Fedeli, Chris) (Entered: 07/24/2018)
2018-07-242LCvR 7.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by JUDICIAL WATCH, INC. (Fedeli, Chris) (Entered: 07/24/2018)
2018-07-24Case Assigned to Judge Emmet G. Sullivan. (zsth) (Entered: 07/24/2018)
2018-07-243SUMMONS (5) Issued Electronically as to U.S. DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zsth) (Entered: 07/24/2018)
2018-07-254STANDING ORDER: The parties are directed to read the attached Standing Order Governing Civil Cases Before Judge Emmet G. Sullivan in its entirety upon receipt. The parties are hereby ORDERED to comply with the directives in the attached Standing Order. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on 07/25/18. (Attachment: # 1 Exhibit 1) (mac) (Entered: 07/25/2018)
2018-08-025NOTICE of Appearance by Joshua L. Rogers on behalf of All Defendants (Rogers, Joshua) (Entered: 08/02/2018)
2018-08-036RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 7/30/2018. ( Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 8/29/2018.), RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 7/31/2018., RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. All Defendants (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Cristina Rotaru)(Fedeli, Chris) (Entered: 08/03/2018)
2018-08-307Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE (Attachments: # 1 Answer)(Rogers, Joshua) (Entered: 08/30/2018)
2018-08-31MINUTE ORDER granting 7 defendants' consent motion for extension of time to file answer. Defendants' answer is hereby deemed filed. Government counsel is reminded of the obligation, pursuant to Local Civil Rule 7(c), to provide a proposed order with each motion and opposition. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on 8/31/2018. (lcegs2) (Entered: 08/31/2018)
2018-10-02MINUTE ORDER. Plaintiff brings this action pursuant to the Freedom of Information Act (FOIA), 5 U.S.C. § 552. The parties are directed to meet and confer and propose a joint scheduling order for further proceedings in this case by no later than November 2, 2018. The parties joint proposed scheduling order shall address the following: (1) The status of plaintiffs FOIA request; (2) The anticipated number of documents responsive to plaintiffs FOIA request; (3) The anticipated date(s) for release of documents responsive to plaintiffs FOIA request; (4) Whether a motion for an Open America stay is likely in this case; (5) Whether a Vaughn index will be required in this case; (6) Whether this case would benefit from referral to a magistrate judge or the District Court Mediation Program for purposes of settlement; and (7) A proposed briefing schedule for dispositive motions, if applicable. If the parties are unable to agree on a joint recommendation, the joint proposed scheduling order shall include each partys individual recommendations. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on 10/2/2018. (lcegs2) (Entered: 10/02/2018)
2018-10-02Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Scheduling Order due by 11/2/2018. (mac) (Entered: 10/02/2018)
2018-11-028Joint PROPOSED BRIEFING SCHEDULE by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Rogers, Joshua) Modified event title on 11/6/2018 (znmw). (Entered: 11/02/2018)
2018-11-07MINUTE ORDER. In light of 8 the parties' joint proposed schedule, the parties are directed to file a joint status report by no later than January 30, 2019. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on 11/7/2018. (lcegs2) (Entered: 11/07/2018)
2018-11-07Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 1/30/2019. (mac) (Entered: 11/07/2018)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar