Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleSOUTHERN POVERTY LAW CENTER v. UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY et al
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2018cv01725
Date Filed2018-07-24
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Amy Berman Jackson
PlaintiffSOUTHERN POVERTY LAW CENTER
Case DescriptionThe Southern Poverty Law Center submitted a FOIA request to U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement for records concerning policies for using local law enforcement to arrest aliens on local criminal charges under color of federal authority. SPLC also requested a fee waiver. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request and took a 10-day extension. SPLC contacted the agency to inquiry about its status, but after hearing nothing further from the agency, SPLC filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantUNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY
DefendantUNITED STATES IMMIGRATION AND CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2018-07-241COMPLAINT for Injunctive Relief against All Defendants with Jury Demand ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-5602526) filed by SOUTHERN POVERTY LAW CENTER. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Civil Cover Sheet, # 4 Summons - United States Department of Homeland Security, # 5 Summons - United States Immigration and Customs Enforcement)(Stratton, Grayson) (Entered: 07/24/2018)
2018-07-24Case Assigned to Judge Amy Berman Jackson. (zmd) (Entered: 07/25/2018)
2018-07-252SUMMONS (2) Issued Electronically as to UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, UNITED STATES IMMIGRATION AND CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT. (Attachments: # 1 Notice and Consent) (zmd) (Entered: 07/25/2018)
2018-07-253ERRATA Regarding Complaint Caption Page by SOUTHERN POVERTY LAW CENTER. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Stratton, Grayson) (Entered: 07/25/2018)
2018-09-044NOTICE of Appearance by Marina Utgoff Braswell on behalf of UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, UNITED STATES IMMIGRATION AND CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT (Braswell, Marina) (Entered: 09/04/2018)
2018-09-065Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 1 Complaint, by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, UNITED STATES IMMIGRATION AND CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT (Braswell, Marina) (Entered: 09/06/2018)
2018-09-076RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. UNITED STATES IMMIGRATION AND CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT served on 7/31/2018 (Stratton, Grayson) (Entered: 09/07/2018)
2018-09-077RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY served on 7/31/2018 (Stratton, Grayson) (Entered: 09/07/2018)
2018-09-078RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 8/1/2018. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 8/31/2018. (Stratton, Grayson) (Entered: 09/07/2018)
2018-09-079RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 8/1/2018. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 8/31/2018. (Stratton, Grayson) (Entered: 09/07/2018)
2018-09-0710RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 8/1/2018. (Stratton, Grayson) (Entered: 09/07/2018)
2018-09-0711RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 8/1/2018. (Stratton, Grayson) (Entered: 09/07/2018)
2018-09-07MINUTE ORDER granting 5 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Defendants must file a responsive pleading by September 14, 2018. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 9/7/2018. (lcabj2) (Entered: 09/07/2018)
2018-09-0712MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Brett Solberg, :Firm- DLA Piper LLP (US), :Address- 1000 Louisiana St., Ste. 2800, Houston, TX 77002. Phone No. - 713.425.8482. Fax No. - 713.425.8401 Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0090-5678347. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by SOUTHERN POVERTY LAW CENTER (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of Brett Solberg, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Stratton, Grayson) (Entered: 09/07/2018)
2018-09-0713MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Betsey Boutelle, :Firm- DLA Piper LLP (US), :Address- 401 B Street, Suite 1700, San Diego, CA 92101. Phone No. - 619.699.2700. Fax No. - 619.699.2701 Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0090-5678382. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by SOUTHERN POVERTY LAW CENTER (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of Betsey Boutelle, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Stratton, Grayson) (Entered: 09/07/2018)
2018-09-10MINUTE ORDER granting 12 13 Motions for Leave of Brett Solberg and Betsey Boutelle to Appear Pro Hac Vice only upon condition that the lawyers admitted, or at least one member of the lawyers' firm, undergo CM/ECF training, obtain a CM/ECF username and password, and agree to file papers electronically. No court papers will be mailed to any lawyer. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 9/10/18. (DMK) (Entered: 09/10/2018)
2018-09-1414ANSWER to Complaint by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, UNITED STATES IMMIGRATION AND CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT.(Braswell, Marina) (Entered: 09/14/2018)
2018-09-1715ORDER. Before the Court in this FOIA case are a complaint and an answer. The requirements of Local Civil Rule 16.3 and Rule 26(f) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure appear to be inapplicable. Defendants shall file a dispositive motion or, in the alternative, a report setting forth the schedule for the completion of its production of documents to plaintiff on or before October 17, 2018. See Order for details. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 9/17/2018. (lcabj2) (Entered: 09/17/2018)
2018-10-1716STATUS REPORT by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, UNITED STATES IMMIGRATION AND CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT. (Braswell, Marina) (Entered: 10/17/2018)
2018-10-19MINUTE ORDER. The defendants must complete their search by November 16, 2018 and submit another status report by November 19, 2018. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 10/19/2018. (lcabj2) (Entered: 10/19/2018)
2018-11-1917STATUS REPORT by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, UNITED STATES IMMIGRATION AND CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT. (Braswell, Marina) (Entered: 11/19/2018)
2018-11-21MINUTE ORDER. In the status report 17 filed on November 19, 2018, defendant proposed a schedule for the processing and production of records identified in its search, but it did not indicate how many records are involved. Defendant must supplement its status report by November 28, 2018 and inform the Court of the number of records or pages awaiting review. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 11/21/2018. (lcabj2) (Entered: 11/21/2018)
2018-11-2818STATUS REPORT by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, UNITED STATES IMMIGRATION AND CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT. (Braswell, Marina) (Entered: 11/28/2018)
2018-12-04MINUTE ORDER. Defendants must submit another status report by January 28, 2019. The Court encourages the parties to meet and confer in an effort to narrow the request or to prioritize the production, so that a more efficient schedule can be proposed in January. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 12/4/2018. (lcabj2) (Entered: 12/04/2018)
2019-01-2519Consent MOTION to Stay (Defendants' Consent Motion to Stay Proceedings in Light of Lapse of Appropriations) by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, UNITED STATES IMMIGRATION AND CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Braswell, Marina) (Entered: 01/25/2019)
2019-01-29MINUTE ORDER denying 19 Motion to Stay. In light of the government's resumption of operations, defendants must submit a status report by February 4, 2019. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 1/29/2019. (lcabj2) (Entered: 01/29/2019)
2019-02-0420STATUS REPORT by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, UNITED STATES IMMIGRATION AND CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT. (Braswell, Marina) (Entered: 02/04/2019)
2019-02-05MINUTE ORDER. Defendants must submit another status report by March 4, 2019. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 2/5/2019. (lcabj2) (Entered: 02/05/2019)
2019-03-0421STATUS REPORT by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, UNITED STATES IMMIGRATION AND CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT. (Braswell, Marina) (Entered: 03/04/2019)
2019-03-06MINUTE ORDER. Defendants must submit another status report by April 30, 2019. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 3/6/2019. (lcabj2) (Entered: 03/06/2019)
2019-04-3022STATUS REPORT by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, UNITED STATES IMMIGRATION AND CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT. (Braswell, Marina) (Entered: 04/30/2019)
2019-05-01MINUTE ORDER. Defendants must submit another status report by June 12, 2019. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 5/1/2019. (lcabj2) (Entered: 05/01/2019)
2019-06-1223STATUS REPORT by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, UNITED STATES IMMIGRATION AND CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT. (Braswell, Marina) (Entered: 06/12/2019)
2019-06-14MINUTE ORDER. Defendants must submit another status report by July 25, 2019. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 6/14/2019. (lcabj2) (Entered: 06/14/2019)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar