Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleO'DONNELL v. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2018cv01727
Date Filed2018-07-24
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Randolph D. Moss
PlaintiffCHRISTOPHER D. O'DONNELL
Case DescriptionChristopher O'Donnell, president of Development Essentials, submitted a FOIA request to the Department of State for the U.S. Embassy Local Compensation Plan for each country in which the U.S. Agency for International Development implements development work. O'Donnell paid $7,200 in estimated search and duplication costs. The agency acknowledged receipt of the fees, but after hearing nothing further from the agency, O'Donnell filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantU.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2018-07-241COMPLAINT against U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 4616093784) filed by CHRISTOPHER D. O'DONNELL. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet)(ztd) (Entered: 07/24/2018)
2018-07-24SUMMONS (3) Issued as to U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (ztd) (Entered: 07/24/2018)
2018-07-252STANDING ORDER: The parties are hereby ORDERED to comply with the directives set forth in the attached Standing Order. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 7/25/18. (lcrdm3, ) (Entered: 07/25/2018)
2018-08-083ENTERED IN ERROR.....RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE served on 7/24/2018. RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General; Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 7/24/2018. RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney; Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 7/24/2018. ( Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 8/23/2018.) (tth); Modified on 8/16/2018 (tth). (Entered: 08/09/2018)
2018-08-084AFFIDAVIT OF MAILING re 1 Complaint by CHRISTOPHER D. O'DONNELL. (tth) (Entered: 08/16/2018)
2018-08-16NOTICE OF CORRECTED DOCKET ENTRY: re 3 Summons Returned Executed as to Federal Defendant, Summons Returned Executed as to U.S. Attorney General, Summons Returned Executed in FOIA as to U.S. Attorney, was entered in error and will be refiled. (tth) (Entered: 08/16/2018)
2018-08-205NOTICE of Appearance by Marsha Wellknown Yee on behalf of U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Yee, Marsha) (Entered: 08/20/2018)
2018-08-206MOTION for Extension of Time to File Defendant's Response to Plaintiff's Complaint by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order, # 2 Certificate of Service)(Yee, Marsha) (Entered: 08/20/2018)
2018-08-20MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of Defendant's Motion for Extension of Time 6 , it is hereby ORDERED that the motion is GRANTED. Defendant shall file its response to Plaintiff's complaint on or before September 20, 2018. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 8/20/2018. (lcrdm3, ) (Entered: 08/20/2018)
2018-08-21Set/Reset Deadlines: Defendant shall file its response to Plaintiff's complaint on or before 9/20/2018. (kt) (Entered: 08/21/2018)
2018-08-27SUMMONS (1) REISSUED as to U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE. (zmd) (Entered: 08/27/2018)
2018-09-047AFFIDAVIT by CHRISTOPHER D. O'DONNELL re Summons and Complaint. (ztl) (Entered: 09/11/2018)
2018-09-208ANSWER to 1 Complaint by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Yee, Marsha) (Entered: 09/20/2018)
2018-09-219AFFIDAVIT FOR DEFAULT by CHRISTOPHER D. O'DONNELL. (ztd) (Entered: 09/25/2018)
2018-09-25MINUTE ORDER: The parties are hereby ORDERED to appear for an Initial Scheduling Conference on October 25, 2018, at 10:00 a.m. in Courtroom 21. It is further ORDERED that the parties shall confer in advance of the Initial Scheduling Conference on (1) whether any records can be released, and (2) the proper next steps in this litigation. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 9/25/2018. (lcrdm3, ) (Entered: 09/25/2018)
2018-09-25Set/Reset Hearings: Initial Scheduling Conference set for 10/25/2018, at 10:00 AM, in Courtroom 21, before Judge Randolph D. Moss. (kt) (Entered: 09/25/2018)
2018-09-2710RESPONSE re 8 Answer to Complaint filed by CHRISTOPHER D. O'DONNELL. (ztd) (Entered: 10/02/2018)
2018-10-2311NOTICE to the Court by CHRISTOPHER D. O'DONNELL (ztd) Modified on 10/26/2018 (jf). (Entered: 10/25/2018)
2018-10-25Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Randolph D. Moss: Initial Scheduling Conference held on 10/25/2018. Defendant shall complete production of documents on or before 1/2/2019; The parties shall file a Joint Status Report on or before 1/16/2019. (Court Reporter: Jeff Hook.) (kt) (Entered: 10/25/2018)
2018-10-2912SURREPLY filed by CHRISTOPHER D. O'DONNELL. "LET IT BE FILED" signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 10/29/18 (ztd) (Entered: 10/31/2018)
2018-12-1813Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Defendant's Processing by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE (Attachments: # 1 Declaration Eric F. Stein, # 2 Text of Proposed Order, # 3 Certificate of Service)(Yee, Marsha) (Entered: 12/18/2018)
2018-12-21MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of Defendant's unopposed motion for extension of time 13 , it is hereby ORDERED that the motion is GRANTED. Defendant shall complete its processing of documents on or before March 4, 2019. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 12/21/2018. (lcrdm3, ) (Entered: 12/21/2018)
2018-12-21Set/Reset Deadlines: Defendant shall complete its processing of documents on or before 3/4/2019. (kt) (Entered: 12/21/2018)
2019-01-1114MOTION to Stay , MOTION for Extension of Time to in Light of Lapse of Appropriations by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Hudak, Brian) (Entered: 01/11/2019)
2019-01-1115Civil Statement from Plaintiff re: defendant's interim response. (ztd) (Entered: 01/18/2019)
2019-01-14MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of the government's motion for a stay 14 , it is hereby ORDERED that the motion is GRANTED. This case shall be STAYED until Congress appropriates funding for the Department of Justice to resume work. It is further ORDERED that the parties shall submit their joint status report within fourteen (14) days of Congress appropriating such funding. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 1/14/2019. (lcrdm3, ) (Entered: 01/14/2019)
2019-01-1816Civil Statement from Plaintiff Christopher D. O'Donnell "Leave to file GRANTED" signed 1/18/19 by Judge Randolph D. Moss. (ztd) (Entered: 01/28/2019)
2019-01-31MINUTE ORDER: In light of the restoration of funding, this case is hereby UNSTAYED. It is further ORDERED that the parties shall file a further joint status report on or before February 8, 2019. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 1/31/2019. (lcrdm3, ) (Entered: 01/31/2019)
2019-02-01Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 2/8/2019. (kt) (Entered: 02/01/2019)
2019-02-0817Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE. (Yee, Marsha) (Entered: 02/08/2019)
2019-02-10MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of the parties' joint status report 17 , it is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall file a further joint status report on or before April 30, 2019. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 2/10/2019. (lcrdm3, ) (Entered: 02/10/2019)
2019-02-11Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 4/30/2019. (kt) (Entered: 02/11/2019)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar