Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleALLIED PROGRESS v. OFFICE OF MANAGEMENT AND BUDGET et al
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2018cv01728
Date Filed2018-07-25
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Tanya S. Chutkan
PlaintiffALLIED PROGRESS
Case DescriptionAllied Progress submitted four FOIA requests to OMB and the Consumer Financial Protection Bureau for records concerning OMB Associate Director Kathy Kraninger, who had been nominated to head CFPB. Allied Progress also requested expedited processing. The agencies acknowledged receipt of the requests, but after hearing nothing further from either agency, Allied Progress filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantOFFICE OF MANAGEMENT AND BUDGET
DefendantCONSUMER FINANCIAL PROTECTION BUREAU
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
Complaint attachment 6
Complaint attachment 7
Complaint attachment 8
Complaint attachment 9
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2018-07-251COMPLAINT against CONSUMER FINANCIAL PROTECTION BUREAU, OFFICE OF MANAGEMENT AND BUDGET ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-5603365) filed by ALLIED PROGRESS. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons, # 3 Summons, # 4 Summons, # 5 Summons, # 6 Exhibit Ex A, # 7 Exhibit Ex B, # 8 Exhibit Ex C, # 9 Exhibit Ex D)(McGrath, Daniel) (Entered: 07/25/2018)
2018-07-26Case Assigned to Judge Tanya S. Chutkan. (zsb) (Entered: 07/26/2018)
2018-07-262SUMMONS (4) Issued Electronically as to CONSUMER FINANCIAL PROTECTION BUREAU, OFFICE OF MANAGEMENT AND BUDGET, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zsb) (Entered: 07/27/2018)
2018-07-303LCvR 7.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by ALLIED PROGRESS (McGrath, Daniel) (Entered: 07/30/2018)
2018-08-064NOTICE of Appearance by Scott Leeson Sroka on behalf of All Defendants (Sroka, Scott) (Entered: 08/06/2018)
2018-08-165RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 7/30/2018. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 8/29/2018. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Ex A)(McGrath, Daniel) (Entered: 08/16/2018)
2018-08-166RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 8/6/2018. RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. CONSUMER FINANCIAL PROTECTION BUREAU served on 8/3/2018; OFFICE OF MANAGEMENT AND BUDGET served on 8/6/2018. (See Docket Entry 5 to view document). (tth) (Entered: 08/20/2018)
2018-08-297ANSWER to Complaint by CONSUMER FINANCIAL PROTECTION BUREAU, OFFICE OF MANAGEMENT AND BUDGET.(Sroka, Scott) (Entered: 08/29/2018)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar