Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleCAUSE OF ACTION INSTITUTE v. CENTERS FOR MEDICARE AND MEDICAID SERVICES
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2018cv01734
Date Filed2018-07-25
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge James E. Boasberg
PlaintiffCAUSE OF ACTION INSTITUTE
Case DescriptionCause of Action Institute submitted a FOIA request to the Centers for Medicare and Medicaid Services for records concerning a waiver of the requirements of Section 1903 of the Social Security Act granted to any governmental entity in Colorado. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request. The agency then disclosed a three-page document to COA. COA asked the agency if that was its final determination, arguing that the three-page document did not respond to all parts of its request. The agency agreed, but after hearing nothing further from the agency, COA filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Adequacy - Search, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantCENTERS FOR MEDICARE AND MEDICAID SERVICES
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
Complaint attachment 6
Complaint attachment 7
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2018-07-251COMPLAINT against CENTERS FOR MEDICARE AND MEDICAID SERVICES ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-5604061) filed by CAUSE OF ACTION INSTITUTE. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Civil Cover Sheet, # 5 Summons CMS, # 6 Summons AG, # 7 Summons Clerk)(Valvo, Russel) (Entered: 07/25/2018)
2018-07-252Corporate Disclosure Statement by CAUSE OF ACTION INSTITUTE. (Valvo, Russel) (Entered: 07/25/2018)
2018-07-253NOTICE of Appearance by Lee A. Steven on behalf of CAUSE OF ACTION INSTITUTE (Steven, Lee) (Entered: 07/25/2018)
2018-07-25Case Assigned to Judge James E. Boasberg. (zmd) (Entered: 07/27/2018)
2018-07-274SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to CENTERS FOR MEDICARE AND MEDICAID SERVICES, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: # 1 Notice and Consent) (zmd) (Entered: 07/27/2018)
2018-08-065RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 8/6/2018. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 9/5/2018. (Valvo, Russel) (Entered: 08/06/2018)
2018-08-066ENTERED IN ERROR.....RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 08/06/2018. (Valvo, Russel) Modified on 8/7/2018 (zrdj). (Entered: 08/06/2018)
2018-08-067RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. CENTERS FOR MEDICARE AND MEDICAID SERVICES served on 8/1/2018 (Valvo, Russel) (Entered: 08/06/2018)
2018-08-07NOTICE OF CORRECTED DOCKET ENTRY: re 6 Summons Returned Executed as to U.S. Attorney General was entered in error (Blank document) and counsel is instructed to refile said pleading completed. (zrdj) (Entered: 08/07/2018)
2018-08-078RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 8/6/2018. (Valvo, Russel) (Entered: 08/07/2018)
2018-08-219NOTICE of Appearance by Joshua L. Rogers on behalf of CENTERS FOR MEDICARE AND MEDICAID SERVICES (Rogers, Joshua) (Entered: 08/21/2018)
2018-09-0510ANSWER to Complaint by CENTERS FOR MEDICARE AND MEDICAID SERVICES.(Rogers, Joshua) (Entered: 09/05/2018)
2018-09-06MINUTE ORDER: The Court ORDERS that the parties shall meet, confer, and submit a joint proposed briefing schedule by September 20, 2018. So ORDERED by Judge James E. Boasberg on 9/6/2018. (lcjeb1) (Entered: 09/06/2018)
2018-09-06Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Proposed Briefing Schedule due by 9/20/2018. (znbn) (Entered: 09/07/2018)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar