Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleGOVERNMENT ACCOUNTABILITY & OVERSIGHT P.C. v. UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2018cv01739
Date Filed2018-07-25
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Timothy J. Kelly
PlaintiffGOVERNMENT ACCOUNTABILITY & OVERSIGHT P.C.
Case DescriptionGovernment Accountability & Oversight submitted two FOIA request to the National Institute for Environmental Health Studies for records concerning emails sent to or from a named individual to three identified outside email addresses. The agency acknowledged receipt of the requests, but after hearing nothing further from the agency, GAO filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantUNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2018-07-251COMPLAINT FILED against UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES HHS ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-5605024) filed by GOVERNMENT ACCOUNTABILITY & OVERSIGHT P.C.. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons Request for Summons HHS, # 3 Summons Request for Summons DoJ, # 4 Summons Request for Summons USADC)(Horner, Christopher) (Entered: 07/25/2018)
2018-07-252NOTICE OF CONSENT TO MAGISTRATE by GOVERNMENT ACCOUNTABILITY & OVERSIGHT P.C. (Horner, Christopher) (Entered: 07/25/2018)
2018-07-26Case Assigned to Judge Timothy J. Kelly. (zsb) (Entered: 07/26/2018)
2018-07-263NOTICE of Appearance by Jason T. Miller on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Miller, Jason) (Entered: 07/26/2018)
2018-07-264REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO ISSUE to ATTORNEY GENERAL and US ATTORNEY filed by GOVERNMENT ACCOUNTABILITY & OVERSIGHT P.C.. (Attachments: # 1 Summons Request for Summons Attorney General, # 2 Summons Request for Summons USADC)(Horner, Christopher) (Entered: 07/26/2018)
2018-07-275SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General, (tth); Modified event text on 7/27/2018 (tth). (Entered: 07/27/2018)
2018-07-306REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO ISSUE to UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES HHS filed by GOVERNMENT ACCOUNTABILITY & OVERSIGHT P.C..(Miller, Jason) (Main Document 6 replaced on 7/30/2018) (ztth). Modified to remove header on 7/30/2018 (tth). (Entered: 07/30/2018)
2018-07-307SUMMONS (1) Reissued Electronically as to UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES. (tth) (Entered: 07/30/2018)
2018-08-098RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 8/3/2018. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 9/2/2018. (Miller, Jason) (Entered: 08/09/2018)
2018-08-099RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 08/03/2018. (Miller, Jason) (Entered: 08/09/2018)
2018-08-1710RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES served on 8/3/2018 (Miller, Jason) (Entered: 08/17/2018)
2018-09-0411NOTICE of Appearance by Denise M. Clark on behalf of UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES (Clark, Denise) (Entered: 09/04/2018)
2018-09-0412ANSWER to Complaint by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES.(Clark, Denise) (Entered: 09/04/2018)
2018-09-05MINUTE ORDER: Before the Court in this FOIA case are a complaint and an answer. It is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall meet, confer, and file a joint proposed schedule for briefing or disclosure by September 25, 2018. Signed by Judge Timothy J. Kelly on 9/5/2018. (lctjk2) (Entered: 09/05/2018)
2018-09-05Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Proposed Briefing Schedule or Disclosure due by 9/25/2018. (kh) (Entered: 09/05/2018)
2018-09-2113Joint STATUS REPORT by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES. (Clark, Denise) (Entered: 09/21/2018)
2018-09-23MINUTE ORDER: In light of the parties' 13 Joint Status Report, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall file a further joint status report, including, if necessary, a proposed briefing schedule, by November 7, 2018. Signed by Judge Timothy J. Kelly on 9/23/2018. (lctjk2) (Entered: 09/23/2018)
2018-11-0714Joint STATUS REPORT by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES. (Clark, Denise) (Entered: 11/07/2018)
2018-11-08MINUTE ORDER: In light of the parties' 14 Joint Status Report, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall file a further joint status report, including, if necessary, a proposed briefing schedule, by December 7, 2018. Signed by Judge Timothy J. Kelly on 11/8/2018. (lctjk2) (Entered: 11/08/2018)
2018-11-0815NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF APPEARANCE as to GOVERNMENT ACCOUNTABILITY & OVERSIGHT P.C.. Attorney Jason T. Miller terminated. (Miller, Jason) (Entered: 11/08/2018)
2018-12-0716Joint STATUS REPORT by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES. (Clark, Denise) (Entered: 12/07/2018)
2018-12-07MINUTE ORDER: In light of the parties' 16 Joint Status Report, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall file a further joint status report, including, if necessary, a proposed briefing schedule, by January 7, 2019. Signed by Judge Timothy J. Kelly on 12/7/2018. (lctjk2) (Entered: 12/07/2018)
2019-01-0417Consent MOTION to Stay (Defendant's Consent Motion to Stay Proceedings in Light of Lapse of Appropriations) by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES (Clark, Denise) (Entered: 01/04/2019)
2019-01-04MINUTE ORDER: It is hereby ORDERED that the deadline set forth in the Court's Minute Order of December 7, 2018, to submit a joint status report, including, if necessary, a proposed briefing schedule, is extended to January 28, 2019. Signed by Judge Timothy J. Kelly on 1/4/2019. (lctjk2) (Entered: 01/04/2019)
2019-01-24MINUTE ORDER: It is hereby ORDERED that the deadline set forth in the Court's Minute Order of January 4, 2019, to submit a joint status report, including, if necessary, a proposed briefing schedule, is extended to March 4, 2019. Signed by Judge Timothy J. Kelly on 1/24/2019. (lctjk2) (Entered: 01/24/2019)
2019-01-29MINUTE ORDER denying Defendant's 17 Unopposed Motion to Stay. In light of the restoration of funding to the Department of Justice, it is hereby ORDERED that Defendant's motion is DENIED AS MOOT. Signed by Judge Timothy J. Kelly on 1/29/2019. (lctjk2) (Entered: 01/29/2019)
2019-02-2818Joint STATUS REPORT filed on behalf of both parties by GOVERNMENT ACCOUNTABILITY & OVERSIGHT P.C.. (Horner, Christopher) (Entered: 02/28/2019)
2019-03-01MINUTE ORDER: In light of the parties' 18 Joint Status Report, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall file, no later than April 8, 2019, a further joint status report updating the Court on their settlement negotiations. Signed by Judge Timothy J. Kelly on 3/1/2019. (lctjk2) (Entered: 03/01/2019)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar