Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleGOVERNMENT ACCOUNTABILITY & OVERSIGHT v. UNITED STATES ENVIRONMENTAL PROTECTION AGENCY
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2018cv01742
Date Filed2018-07-25
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Randolph D. Moss
PlaintiffGOVERNMENT ACCOUNTABILITY & OVERSIGHT
Case DescriptionGovernment Accountability & Oversight submitted two FOIA requests to the EPA for records concerning emails sent to or from two named individuals mentioning email addresses of three outside parties. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request. GAO also requested a fee waiver. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request and denied GAO's request for a fee waiver. After hearing nothing further from the agency, GAO filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantUNITED STATES ENVIRONMENTAL PROTECTION AGENCY
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2018-07-251COMPLAINT FILED against UNITED STATES ENVIRONMENTAL PROTECTION AGENCY EPA ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-5605211) filed by GOVERNMENT ACCOUNTABILITY & OVERSIGHT P.C.. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil cover sheet, # 2 Notice and Consent Consent to Magistrate, # 3 Summons Request for Summons to EPA, # 4 Summons Request for Summons to USADC, # 5 Summons Request for Summons to DOJ)(Horner, Christopher) (Attachment 1 replaced on 7/26/2018) (zsth). (Entered: 07/25/2018)
2018-07-252LCvR 7.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests FILED by GOVERNMENT ACCOUNTABILITY & OVERSIGHT P.C. (Horner, Christopher) (Entered: 07/25/2018)
2018-07-25Case Assigned to Judge Randolph D. Moss. (zsth) (Entered: 07/26/2018)
2018-07-263NOTICE of Appearance by Jason T. Miller on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Miller, Jason) (Entered: 07/26/2018)
2018-07-264STANDING ORDER: The parties are hereby ORDERED to comply with the directives set forth in the Court's Standing Order. See document for details. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 7/26/2018. (lcrdm1, ) (Entered: 07/26/2018)
2018-07-265REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO ISSUE to EPA and ATTORNEY GENERAL filed by GOVERNMENT ACCOUNTABILITY & OVERSIGHT. (Attachments: # 1 Summons Request for Summons Attorney General)(Horner, Christopher) (Entered: 07/26/2018)
2018-08-016SUMMONS (2) Issued Electronically as to UNITED STATES ENVIRONMENTAL PROTECTION AGENCY, U.S. Attorney General (ztd) (Entered: 08/01/2018)
2018-08-017REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO ISSUE US ATTORNEY for DC filed by GOVERNMENT ACCOUNTABILITY & OVERSIGHT.(Miller, Jason) (Entered: 08/01/2018)
2018-08-078SUMMONS (1) Issued Electronically as to U.S. Attorney. (znmw) (Entered: 08/07/2018)
2018-08-179ENTERED IN ERROR.....RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. UNITED STATES ENVIRONMENTAL PROTECTION AGENCY served on 8/13/2018 (Miller, Jason); Modified on 8/27/2018 (tth). (Entered: 08/17/2018)
2018-08-2610RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 8/13/2018. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 9/12/2018. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Postal Tracking Proof of Service)(Miller, Jason) (Entered: 08/26/2018)
2018-08-2611RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 08/13/2018. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Postal Tracking Proof of Service)(Miller, Jason) (Entered: 08/26/2018)
2018-08-27NOTICE OF CORRECTED DOCKET ENTRY: re 9 Summons Returned Executed as to Federal Defendant was entered in error at the request of Plaintiff's counsel and said pleading will be refiled. (tth) (Entered: 08/27/2018)
2018-08-2712RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Postal Tracking Proof of Service)(Miller, Jason) (Entered: 08/27/2018)
2018-09-1213ANSWER to Complaint by UNITED STATES ENVIRONMENTAL PROTECTION AGENCY.(Braswell, Marina) (Entered: 09/12/2018)
2018-09-1314NOTICE of Appearance by Marina Utgoff Braswell on behalf of UNITED STATES ENVIRONMENTAL PROTECTION AGENCY (Braswell, Marina) (Entered: 09/13/2018)
2018-09-14MINUTE ORDER: It is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall appear for a status conference on October 2, 2018, at 10:00 a.m. in Courtroom 21. It is further ORDERED that the parties shall meet and confer prior to the status conference to discuss the status of the agency's search and scheduling for further proceedings. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 9/14/2018. (lcrdm1, ) (Entered: 09/14/2018)
2018-09-14Set/Reset Hearings: Status Conference set for 10/2/2018, at 10:00 AM, in Courtroom 21, before Judge Randolph D. Moss. (kt) (Entered: 09/14/2018)
2018-09-1415Joint MOTION to Continue Reschedule Status Conference , Consent MOTION for Leave to Appear Telephonically for Plaintiff by GOVERNMENT ACCOUNTABILITY & OVERSIGHT (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Text of Proposed Order to Reschedule and Grant Leave to Appear Telephonically)(Horner, Christopher) Modified event title on 9/18/2018 (znmw). (Entered: 09/14/2018)
2018-09-18MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of the Joint Motion to Reschedule Status Conference 15 , it is hereby ORDERED that the motion is GRANTED. The status conference currently scheduled for October 2, 2018, at 10:00 a.m. is hereby VACATED and RESCHEDULED for October 11, 2018, at 10:30 a.m., in Courtroom 21. Any party wishing to appear telephonically shall contact the Courtroom Deputy Clerk at (202) 354-3084 to make the necessary arrangements. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 9/18/2018. (lcrdm1, ) (Entered: 09/18/2018)
2018-09-18Set/Reset Hearings: The Status Conference set for 10/2/2018 is VACATED and RESCHEDULED for 10/11/2018, at 10:30 AM, in Courtroom 21, before Judge Randolph D. Moss. (kt) (Entered: 09/18/2018)
2018-10-11Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Randolph D. Moss: Status Conference held on 10/11/2018. Joint Status Report due by 12/7/2018. Defendant to provide search declaration request to plaintiff by 11/9/2018. (Court Reporter: Jeff Hook.) (jl) (Entered: 10/11/2018)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar