Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleAmerican Civil Liberties Union Foundation of Maryland v. U.S. Department of Homeland Security et al
DistrictDistrict of Maryland
CityBaltimore
Case Number1:2018cv02257
Date Filed2018-07-25
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeChief Judge James K. Bredar
PlaintiffAmerican Civil Liberties Union Foundation of Maryland
Case DescriptionThe ACLU Foundation of Maryland submitted a FOIA request to U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement concerning a claim made by the Harford County Sheriff that it had identified 105 individuals with gang affiliation who merited further screening. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request and ultimately disclosed a spreadsheet with redactions made under Exemption 6 (invasion of privacy) and Exemption 7(C) (invasion of privacy concerning law enforcement records). The ACLU Foundation of Maryland filed an administrative appeal, but after hearing nothing further from the agency, the ACLU Foundation filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantU.S. Department of Homeland Security
DefendantU.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2018-07-251COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0416-7463126.), filed by American Civil Liberties Union Foundation of Maryland. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Exhibit 1, # 3 Summons)(Johnson, Steven) (Entered: 07/25/2018)
2018-07-252Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by American Civil Liberties Union Foundation of Maryland (Johnson, Steven) (Entered: 07/25/2018)
2018-07-253Summons Issued 60 days as to U.S. Department of Homeland Security, U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General(krs, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 07/25/2018)
2018-08-284Correspondence re: Request for Summons (Attachments: # 1 Summons)(Johnson, Steven) (Entered: 08/28/2018)
2018-08-295Summons Reissued as to U.S. Department of Homeland Security, U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement (U.S. Attorney).(krs, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 08/29/2018)
2018-09-066SUMMONS Returned Executed by American Civil Liberties Union Foundation of Maryland. U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement served on 8/30/2018, answer due 10/29/2018. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)(Johnson, Steven) (Entered: 09/06/2018)
2018-09-067SUMMONS Returned Executed by American Civil Liberties Union Foundation of Maryland. U.S. Department of Homeland Security served on 8/30/2018, answer due 10/29/2018. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)(Johnson, Steven) (Entered: 09/06/2018)
2018-10-018NOTICE of Appearance by Molissa Heather Farber on behalf of All Defendants (Farber, Molissa) (Entered: 10/01/2018)
2018-10-029ANSWER to 1 Complaint, by U.S. Department of Homeland Security, U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement.(Farber, Molissa) (Entered: 10/02/2018)
2018-10-0310Correspondence re: Proposed Scheduling Order (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Scheduling Order)(vdcs, Chambers) (Entered: 10/03/2018)
2018-10-17Scheduling Conference held on 10/17/2018 before Chief Judge James K. Bredar.(Court Reporter: None) (mds, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 10/17/2018)
2018-10-1711SCHEDULING ORDER: Status Report due by 2/15/2019. Signed by Chief Judge James K. Bredar on 10/17/18. (krs, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 10/17/2018)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar