Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleWestern Watersheds Project v. USDA APHIS Wildlife Services
DistrictDistrict of Idaho
CityDatabaseVersion 6.1.2 Boise - Southern
Case Number1:2018cv00335
Date Filed2018-07-26
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge B. Lynn Winmill
PlaintiffWestern Watersheds Project
Case DescriptionWestern Watersheds Project submitted four FOIA requests to the Animal and Plant Health Inspection Service for records concerning attacks on livestock by wolves. WWP also requested a fee waiver and expedited processing. The agency acknowledged receipt of the requests and denied WWP's request for expedited processing. After hearing nothing further from the agency, WWP filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantUSDA APHIS Wildlife Services
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2018-07-261COMPLAINT against USDA APHIS Wildlife Services ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0976-1765862.), filed by Western Watersheds Project. (Attachments: # 1 Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons)(Lake, Scott)
2018-07-262Corporate Disclosure Statement by Western Watersheds Project. (Lake, Scott)
2018-07-273Summons Issued as to USDA APHIS Wildlife Services. (Print attached Summons for service.) (jp)
2018-08-304ANSWER to 1 Complaint by USDA APHIS Wildlife Services.(Schaefer, James)
2018-09-045CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Western Watersheds Project (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)(Lake, Scott)
2018-09-047LITIGATION ORDER AND NOTICE OF TELEPHONIC SCHEDULING CONFERENCE Telephonic Scheduling Conference set for 10/18/2018 01:30 PM in Telephonic Hearing - Boise Chambers before Judge B. Lynn Winmill. On or before 10/11/18, the parties must file with the Court the joint Litigation Plan and Discovery Plan. Signed by Judge B. Lynn Winmill. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (jp) (Entered: 09/05/2018)
2018-09-056NOTICE of Availability of Magistrate Judge and Requirement for Consent sent to counsel for USDA APHIS Wildlife Services, Western Watersheds Project re 4 Answer to Complaint, 1 Complaint. Consent/Objection to Magistrate due by 11/5/2018. (jp)
2018-09-148MOTION for Summary Judgment Scott Lake appearing for Plaintiff Western Watersheds Project. Responses due by 10/5/2018 (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support, # 2 Separate Statement of Fact, # 3 Affidavit of Scott Lake, # 4 Affidavit of Kristin Ruether, # 5 Exhibit 1, # 6 Exhibit 2, # 7 Exhibit 3, # 8 Exhibit 4, # 9 Exhibit 5, # 10 Exhibit 6, # 11 Exhibit 7, # 12 Exhibit 8, # 13 Exhibit 9, # 14 Exhibit 10, # 15 Exhibit 11, # 16 Exhibit 12, # 17 Exhibit 13, # 18 Exhibit 14, # 19 Exhibit 15, # 20 Exhibit 16, # 21 Exhibit 17, # 22 Exhibit 18, # 23 Exhibit 19, # 24 Exhibit 20, # 25 Exhibit 21, # 26 Exhibit 22)(Lake, Scott)
2018-09-289NOTICE of Appearance by Robert Burke Firpo on behalf of USDA APHIS Wildlife Services (Firpo, Robert)
2018-10-0110MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 8 MOTION for Summary Judgment (Unopposed) Robert Burke Firpo appearing for Defendant USDA APHIS Wildlife Services. Responses due by 10/22/2018 (Firpo, Robert)
2018-10-0211DOCKET ENTRY ORDER granting 10 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply. Defendant shall file a response brief to the pending motion for summary judgment 8 on or before October 19, 2018. Signed by Judge B. Lynn Winmill. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (dm)
2018-10-10Set/Reset Deadlines as to 8 MOTION for Summary Judgment pursuant to Order 11 . Responses due by 10/19/2018. (jlb)
2018-10-1112Joint MOTION to Stay Briefing and Scheduling Conference Scott Lake appearing for Plaintiff Western Watersheds Project. Responses due by 11/1/2018 (Lake, Scott)
2018-10-1113SCHEDULING CONFERENCE FORM - LITIGATION PLAN by Western Watersheds Project. (Attachments: # 1 Supplement to Joint Litigation Plan)(Lake, Scott)
2018-10-1514ORDER Granting 12 Joint MOTION to Stay Briefing and Vacate Telephonic Scheduling Conference filed by Western Watersheds Project. The 10/18/18 scheduling conference is VACATED, and further briefing is STAYED until 12/14/18, with the briefing schedule to be reset as necessary after that date. Signed by Judge B. Lynn Winmill. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (jp) (Entered: 10/16/2018)
2018-10-1815Docket entry only - CONSENT to Magistrate Judge filed. (jp) (Entered: 10/22/2018)
2018-11-06The 60 day deadline has expired. Case will remain with District Judge. No more notice of availability or assignment will be sent out. Consent deadline(s) termed. (jp)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar