Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleLORANCE v. DEPARTMENT OF THE AIR FORCE
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2018cv01762
Date Filed2018-07-28
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Dabney L. Friedrich
PlaintiffCLINT A. LORANCE
Case DescriptionClint Lorance, submitted a FOIA request to the Department of the Air Force for records concerning the deaths of six airmen at Bagram Air Force Base in Afghanistan on December 21, 2015. Lorance also requested expedited processing. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request and denied Lorance's request for expedited processing. After hearing nothing further from the agency, Lorance filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Adequacy - Search, Litigation - Vaughn index, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantDEPARTMENT OF THE AIR FORCE
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
Complaint attachment 6
Complaint attachment 7
Complaint attachment 8
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2018-07-281COMPLAINT against CLINT A. LORANCE ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-5609009) filed by CLINT A. LORANCE. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C, # 5 Exhibit D, # 6 Summons Attorney General, # 7 Summons U.S. Attorney, # 8 Summons U.S. Air Force)(Maher, John) (Attachment 1 replaced on 7/30/2018) (zsth). (Entered: 07/28/2018)
2018-07-28Case Assigned to Judge Dabney L. Friedrich. (zsth) (Entered: 07/30/2018)
2018-07-312REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO ISSUE filed by CLINT A. LORANCE. (Attachments: # 1 Summons U.S. Attorney, # 2 Summons U.S. Air Force)(Maher, John) (Entered: 07/31/2018)
2018-08-013SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to DEPARTMENT OF THE AIR FORCE, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (tth) (Entered: 08/01/2018)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar