Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleEL AMIN v. WORKMAN et al
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2018cv01811
Date Filed2018-07-30
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Timothy J. Kelly
PlaintiffSALEEM EL AMIN
DefendantWORKMAN Ms., Education Department FCI McDowell
TERMINATED: 08/23/2018
DefendantWORKMAN Ms., Education Department FCI McDowell
DefendantUNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Documents
Docket
Complaint
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2018-07-30Initiating Pleading & IFP Application Received on 07/30/2018. A copy of the docket sheet has been mailed to the address of record for the pro se party. (zsb) (Entered: 08/02/2018)
2018-07-301COMPLAINT against UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, WORKMAN filed by SALEEM EL AMIN.(zsb) (Entered: 08/02/2018)
2018-07-302MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by SALEEM EL AMIN (zsb) (Entered: 08/02/2018)
2018-07-303PRISONER TRUST FUND ACCOUNT STATEMENT by SALEEM EL AMIN (zsb) (Entered: 08/02/2018)
2018-08-164ORDERED that defendant Workman is DISMISSED as a party defendant, and it is FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk of Court shall assign this action randomly to a judge for further proceedings. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 8/15/18. (zsth) (Entered: 08/22/2018)
2018-08-165ORDER directing an initial partial filing fee in the amount of $10.82 from Prison Account of Saleem El Amin and granting MOTION for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis (see order for full details). Pro Se party has been notified by first class mail. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 8/15/18. (zsth) (Entered: 08/22/2018)
2018-08-16Case Reassigned to Judge Timothy J. Kelly. Unassigned is no longer assigned to the case. (zsth) (Entered: 08/22/2018)
2018-11-016MOTION to Pay Litigation Cost by SALEEM EL AMIN. "Leave to File GRANTED" by Judge Timothy J. Kelly on 11/1/2018. (tth) (Entered: 11/02/2018)
2018-11-017MOTION for Speedy Resolution by SALEEM EL AMIN. "Leave to File GRANTED" by Judge Timothy J. Kelly on 11/1/2018. (tth) (Entered: 11/02/2018)
2018-12-108SUMMONS (2) Issued as to UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (zrdj) (Entered: 12/10/2018)
2019-01-159RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 1/7/2019. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 2/6/2019. (tth); Modified text on 1/24/2019 (tth). (Entered: 01/17/2019)
2019-02-0610MOTION for Extension of Time to File Defendants' Answer or Other Response to Plaintiff's Complaint by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA (Adebonojo, Kenneth) (Entered: 02/06/2019)
2019-02-07MINUTE ORDER granting Defendant's 10 Motion for Extension of Time. It is hereby ORDERED, nunc pro tunc to February 6, 2019, that Defendant shall file its response to Plaintiff's 1 Complaint by March 15, 2019. Signed by Judge Timothy J. Kelly on 2/7/2019. (lctjk3) (Entered: 02/07/2019)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar