Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleNATIONAL STUDENT LEGAL DEFENSE NETWORK v. UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF VETERANS AFFAIRS
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2018cv01827
Date Filed2018-08-03
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeChief Judge Beryl A. Howell
PlaintiffNATIONAL STUDENT LEGAL DEFENSE NETWORK
Case DescriptionThe National Student Legal Defense Network submitted a FOIA request to the Department of Veterans Affairs for records concerning an agreement with the FTC and steps taken by the VA. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request. NSLDN contacted the agency several times to check the status of the request. After hearing nothing further from the agency, NSLDN filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Adequacy - Search, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantUNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF VETERANS AFFAIRS
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
Complaint attachment 6
Complaint attachment 7
Complaint attachment 8
Complaint attachment 9
Complaint attachment 10
Complaint attachment 11
Complaint attachment 12
Complaint attachment 13
Complaint attachment 14
Complaint attachment 15
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2018-08-031COMPLAINT against UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF VETERANS AFFAIRS ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-5621130) filed by NATIONAL STUDENT LEGAL DEFENSE NETWORK. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7, # 8 Exhibit 8, # 9 Exhibit 9, # 10 Exhibit 10, # 11 Exhibit 11, # 12 Exhibit 12, # 13 Exhibit 13, # 14 Civil Cover Sheet, # 15 Summons)(Upton Fulford, Martha) (Attachment 14 replaced on 8/6/2018) (zmd). (Entered: 08/03/2018)
2018-08-032LCvR 7.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by NATIONAL STUDENT LEGAL DEFENSE NETWORK (Upton Fulford, Martha) (Entered: 08/03/2018)
2018-08-03Case Assigned to Chief Judge Beryl A. Howell. (zmd) (Entered: 08/06/2018)
2018-08-063SUMMONS (1) Issued Electronically as to UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF VETERANS AFFAIRS. (Attachments: # 1 Notice and Consent) (zmd) (Entered: 08/06/2018)
2018-08-074STANDING ORDER. Signed by Chief Judge Beryl A. Howell on August 7, 2018. (lcbah3) (Entered: 08/07/2018)
2018-08-165RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 8/13/2018. ( Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 9/12/2018.), RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 08/13/2018., RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF VETERANS AFFAIRS served on 8/13/2018 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Upton Fulford, Martha) (Entered: 08/16/2018)
2018-09-066NOTICE of Appearance by Joshua M. Kolsky on behalf of UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF VETERANS AFFAIRS (Kolsky, Joshua) (Entered: 09/06/2018)
2018-09-067Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 1 Complaint,, by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF VETERANS AFFAIRS (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Kolsky, Joshua) (Entered: 09/06/2018)
2018-09-07MINUTE ORDER (paperless) GRANTING the defendant's 7 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time and DIRECTING the defendant to file, by September 26, 2018, its answer to the 1 Complaint. Signed by Chief Judge Beryl A. Howell on September 7, 2018. (lcbah3) (Entered: 09/07/2018)
2018-09-07Set/Reset Deadlines: Answer to the Complaint due by 9/26/2018. (tg) (Entered: 09/07/2018)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar