Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleINTERNATIONAL LONGSHOREMEN'S ASSOCIATION, AFL-CIO v. UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF LABOR
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2018cv01830
Date Filed2018-08-03
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge James E. Boasberg
PlaintiffINTERNATIONAL LONGSHOREMEN'S ASSOCIATION, AFL-CIO
Case DescriptionThe International Longshoremen's Association submitted FOIA requests to the Department of Labor for records concerning the investigation of the trusteeship of ILA Local 333. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request. The agency located 1202 responsive pages but only disclosed 208 pages, withholding records under Exemption 4 (confidential business information), Exemption 5 (privileges), Exemption 6 (invasion of privacy), and Exemption 7(E) (investigative methods and techniques). ILA filed an administrative appeal of that decision, but after hearing nothing further from the agency, ILA filed suit.
Complaint issues: Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantUNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF LABOR
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2018-08-031COMPLAINT against UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF LABOR ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-5621444) filed by INTERNATIONAL LONGSHOREMEN'S ASSOCIATION, AFL-CIO. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons)(Starr, Paul) (Entered: 08/03/2018)
2018-08-06Case Assigned to Judge James E. Boasberg. (zsb) (Entered: 08/06/2018)
2018-08-062SUMMONS (1) Issued Electronically as to UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF LABOR. (Attachment: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zsb) (Entered: 08/06/2018)
2018-08-143RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 8/13/2018. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 9/12/2018. (Starr, Paul) (Entered: 08/14/2018)
2018-08-204MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Kyle D. Winnick, :Firm- Marrinan & Mazzola Mardon, P.C., :Address- 26 Broadway, 17th Floor, New York, NY 10004. Phone No. - 212-425-3240. Fax No. - 212-943-6649 Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0090-5646869. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by INTERNATIONAL LONGSHOREMEN'S ASSOCIATION, AFL-CIO (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Starr, Paul) (Entered: 08/20/2018)
2018-08-20MINUTE ORDER GRANTING 4 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of KYLE D. WINNICK. So ORDERED by Judge James E. Boasberg on 8/20/18. (lcjeb1) (Entered: 08/20/2018)
2018-08-245ENTERED IN ERROR.....RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the District of Columbia Attorney General. Date of Service Upon District of Columbia Attorney General 8/20/2018. Answer due for ALL D.C. DEFENDANTS by 9/10/2018. (Starr, Paul) Modified on 9/5/2018 (jf). (Entered: 08/24/2018)
2018-08-246RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 8/20/18. (Starr, Paul) (Entered: 08/24/2018)
2018-08-247RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 8/20/2018. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 9/19/2018. (jf) (Entered: 09/05/2018)
2018-09-05NOTICE OF CORRECTED DOCKET ENTRY: Document No. re 5 Summons Returned Executed as to DC Attorney General, was entered in error and refiled by the clerk's office under the correct category. (jf) (Entered: 09/05/2018)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar