Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleGooch v. United States Department of Justice
DistrictNorthern District of Georgia
CityAtlanta
Case Number1:2018cv03750
Date Filed2018-08-06
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Amy Totenberg
PlaintiffMilton Gooch, III
Case DescriptionMilton Gooch submitted a FOIA request to the Department of Justice for records concerning the civil rights complaint he had filed with the Office of the Inspector General. The agency disclosed some records with redactions under Exemption 6 (invasion of privacy) and Exemption 7(C) (invasion of privacy concerning law enforcement records). Gooch filed an administrative appeal, which was denied. He then filed suit.
Complaint issues: Litigation - Recovery of Costs

DefendantUnited States Department of Justice Office of Inspector General, Office of Information Policy
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2018-08-061COMPLAINT for Injunctive Relief filed by Milton Gooch, III. (Filing fee $400, receipt number GAN100104980) (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet)(ddm) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form. (Entered: 08/07/2018)
2018-08-072Summons Issued as to United States Department of Justice, Office of the Inspector General, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (btql) (Entered: 08/09/2018)
2018-08-173Return of Service Executed by Milton Gooch, III. United States Department of Justice served on 8/9/2018, answer due 10/9/2018. (jtj) (Entered: 08/20/2018)
2018-09-104ANSWER to 1 COMPLAINT by United States Department of Justice. Discovery ends on 2/7/2019.(Manship, Flora) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions. (Entered: 09/10/2018)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar