Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleJUDICIAL WATCH, INC. v. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2018cv01851
Date Filed2018-08-07
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Richard J. Leon
PlaintiffJUDICIAL WATCH, INC.
Case DescriptionJudicial Watch submitted FOIA requests to the Secret Service for records concerning security costs for trips taken by President Trump. The agency acknowledged receipt of the requests, but after hearing nothing further from the agency, Judicial Watch filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Adequacy - Search, Litigation - Vaughn index, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantU.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2018-08-071COMPLAINT against U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-5626218) filed by JUDICIAL WATCH, INC.. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons U.S. Attorney for the District of Columbia, # 3 Summons U.S. Attorney General, # 4 Summons Department of Homeland Security)(Burke, Lauren) (Entered: 08/07/2018)
2018-08-072LCvR 7.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by JUDICIAL WATCH, INC. (Burke, Lauren) (Entered: 08/07/2018)
2018-08-073NOTICE OF RELATED CASE by JUDICIAL WATCH, INC.. Case related to Case No. 15-1983 and 16-863. (Burke, Lauren) (Entered: 08/07/2018)
2018-08-09Case Assigned to Judge Richard J. Leon. (zsb) (Entered: 08/09/2018)
2018-08-104SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zsb) (Entered: 08/10/2018)
2018-08-165ENTERED IN ERROR.....RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 8/14/2018. ( Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 9/13/2018.), RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 08/14/2018., RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY served on 8/13/2018 (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Cristina Rotaru)(Bekesha, Michael) Modified on 8/16/2018 (jf). (Entered: 08/16/2018)
2018-08-16NOTICE OF CORRECTED DOCKET ENTRY: Document No. re 5 Summons Returned Executed in FOIA as to U.S. Attorney,,, Summons Returned Executed as to U.S. Attorney General,,, Summons Returned Executed as to Federal Defendant,, was entered in error at the request of counsel and will be refiled using the correct login/password for counsel. (jf) (Entered: 08/16/2018)
2018-08-166RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 8/14/2018. ( Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 9/13/2018.), RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 08/14/2018., RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Cristina Rotaru)(Burke, Lauren) (Entered: 08/16/2018)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar