Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleJUDICIAL WATCH, INC. v. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2018cv01854
Date Filed2018-08-07
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Amy Berman Jackson
PlaintiffJUDICIAL WATCH, INC.
Case DescriptionJudicial Watch submitted a FOIA request to the Department of Justice for records concerning GPS Fusion, Nellie Ohr, and Christopher Steele. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request and told Judicial Watch that it would need more time to process its request. After hearing nothing further from the agency, Judicial Watch filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Adequacy - Search, Litigation - Vaughn index, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantU.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2018-08-071COMPLAINT against U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-5626473) filed by JUDICIAL WATCH, INC.. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons for U.S. Attorney for DC, # 3 Summons for U.S. Attorney General, # 4 Summons for U.S. Department of Justice)(Cotca, Ramona) (Entered: 08/07/2018)
2018-08-072LCvR 7.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by JUDICIAL WATCH, INC. (Cotca, Ramona) (Entered: 08/07/2018)
2018-08-09Case Assigned to Judge Amy Berman Jackson. (zsb) (Entered: 08/09/2018)
2018-08-103SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zsb) (Entered: 08/10/2018)
2018-08-164RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 8/14/2018. ( Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 9/13/2018.), RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 08/14/2018., RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE served on 8/14/2018 (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Cristina Rotaru)(Cotca, Ramona) (Entered: 08/16/2018)
2018-09-135NOTICE of Appearance by Michael Joseph Gerardi on behalf of U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE (Gerardi, Michael) (Entered: 09/13/2018)
2018-09-136ANSWER to Complaint by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE.(Gerardi, Michael) (Entered: 09/13/2018)
2018-09-14MINUTE ORDER. Before the Court in this FOIA case are a complaint and an answer. The requirements of LCvR 16.3 and Rule 26(f) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure appear to be inapplicable. Defendant shall file a dispositive motion or, in the alternative, a report setting forth the schedule according to which it will complete its production of documents to plaintiff on or before October 12, 2018. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 09/14/2018. (lcabj3) (Entered: 09/14/2018)
2018-10-127Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Gerardi, Michael) (Entered: 10/12/2018)
2018-10-12MINUTE ORDER. In light of the parties' joint status report 7 , it is ORDERED that the parties shall file a further status report by October 19, 2018. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 10/12/18. (DMK) (Entered: 10/12/2018)
2018-10-18Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 10/19/2018. (tb) (Entered: 10/18/2018)
2018-10-198Joint STATUS REPORT (Second) by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Gerardi, Michael) (Entered: 10/19/2018)
2018-10-30MINUTE ORDER. The parties must submit an updated joint status report by December 7, 2018. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 10/30/2018. (lcabj3) (Entered: 10/30/2018)
2018-12-079Joint STATUS REPORT by JUDICIAL WATCH, INC.. (Cotca, Ramona) (Entered: 12/07/2018)
2018-12-10MINUTE ORDER. The parties must submit an updated joint status report by January 21, 2019. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 12/10/2018. (lcabj3) (Entered: 12/10/2018)
2018-12-2610Unopposed MOTION to Stay Forthcoming Processing Deadlines In Light of a Lapse of Appropriations by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Gerardi, Michael) (Entered: 12/26/2018)
2018-12-28MINUTE ORDER granting 10 Unopposed Motion to Stay. The government must file a notice within two days of the resumption of operations and it should include a proposed revised schedule if one is necessary. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 12/28/2018. (lcabj3) (Entered: 12/28/2018)
2019-01-2911NOTICE BY DEFENDANT TO THE COURT OF RESTORATION OF APPROPRIATIONS by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE (Gerardi, Michael) (Entered: 01/29/2019)
2019-01-30MINUTE ORDER. In light of the government's notice 11 , the stay in this case is hereby lifted and the parties must submit a joint status report with a proposed processing schedule by February 5, 2019. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 01/30/2019. (lcabj3) (Entered: 01/30/2019)
2019-02-0512NOTICE of Appearance by Paul J. Orfanedes on behalf of JUDICIAL WATCH, INC. (Orfanedes, Paul) (Main Document 12 replaced on 2/5/2019) (zjf). (Entered: 02/05/2019)
2019-02-0513Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Gerardi, Michael) (Entered: 02/05/2019)
2019-02-06MINUTE ORDER. The parties must submit a joint status report by March 15, 2019. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 02/06/2019. (lcabj3) (Entered: 02/06/2019)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar