Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleASSASSINATION ARCHIVES AND RESEARCH CENTER v. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2018cv01868
Date Filed2018-08-08
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Trevor N. McFadden
PlaintiffASSASSINATION ARCHIVES AND RESEARCH CENTER
Case DescriptionThe Assassination Archives and Research Center submitted a FOIA request to the FBI for seven boxes of indices of pre-1960 electronic surveillance records that the agency had publicly acknowledged in a 2009 court affidavit. AARC requested inclusion in the news media fee category and a fee waiver. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request and denied AARC's request for new media fee status and a fee waiver. The agency told AARC that it had identified 18,000 pages of potentially responsive records, but that 5,000 pages were dated after 1960. The FBI told AARC that it would need to commit to $540 in fees or reduce the scope of the request. AARC did not file an administrative appeal of the FBI's denial of their fee waiver or fee status requests. AARC later submitted three follow-up requests pertaining to the records. The agency did not resolve those requests and AARC filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantDEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2018-08-081COMPLAINT against DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-5629406) filed by ASSASSINATION ARCHIVES AND RESEARCH CENTER. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 LCvR 7.1 certificate, # 3 Summons, # 4 Summons, # 5 Summons)(McClanahan, Kelly) (Entered: 08/08/2018)
2018-08-082LCvR 7.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by ASSASSINATION ARCHIVES AND RESEARCH CENTER (zsb) (Entered: 08/09/2018)
2018-08-09Case Assigned to Judge Trevor N. McFadden. (zsb) (Entered: 08/09/2018)
2018-08-103STANDING ORDER establishing Procedures for Cases Before Judge Trevor N. McFadden. The parties are hereby ORDERED to read and comply with the directives in the attached standing order. Signed by Judge Trevor N. McFadden on 8/10/2018. (lctnm3) (Entered: 08/10/2018)
2018-08-104SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zsb) (Entered: 08/10/2018)
2018-08-235RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 8/20/2018. ( Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 9/19/2018.), RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 8/20/18., RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE served on 8/20/2018 (McClanahan, Kelly) (Entered: 08/23/2018)
2018-09-136NOTICE of Appearance by Rhonda Lisa Campbell on behalf of DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE (Campbell, Rhonda) (Entered: 09/13/2018)
2018-09-197ANSWER to Complaint by DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE.(Campbell, Rhonda) (Entered: 09/19/2018)
2018-09-24MINUTE ORDER. Before the Court are a complaint and an answer in this FOIA case. It is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall meet and confer and file a Joint Status Report proposing a schedule for proceeding in this matter. The schedule should address, among other things, the status of Plaintiff's FOIA request, the anticipated number of documents responsive to Plaintiff's FOIA request, the anticipated date(s) for release of the documents requested by Plaintiff, whether a motion for an Open America stay is likely in this case, whether a Vaughn index will be required in this case, and a briefing schedule for dispositive motions, if required. The parties shall file the schedule on or before October 19, 2018. Signed by Judge Trevor N. McFadden on 9/24/2018. (lctnm3) (Entered: 09/24/2018)
2018-09-24Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 10/19/2018. (hmc) (Entered: 09/24/2018)
2018-10-048ERRATA Answer (Corrected) by DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE 7 Answer to Complaint filed by DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Answer (Corrected))(Campbell, Rhonda) (Entered: 10/04/2018)
2018-10-199Joint STATUS REPORT by ASSASSINATION ARCHIVES AND RESEARCH CENTER. (McClanahan, Kelly) (Entered: 10/19/2018)
2018-10-22MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of the parties' 9 Joint Status Report, it is hereby ORDERED that a further update shall be filed on or before December 7, 2018. This update shall propose a schedule for further proceedings as necessary. Signed by Judge Trevor N. McFadden on 10/22/2018. (lctnm3) (Entered: 10/22/2018)
2018-10-22Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 12/7/2018. (hmc) (Entered: 10/22/2018)
2018-12-0710Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Joint Status Report by ASSASSINATION ARCHIVES AND RESEARCH CENTER (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(McClanahan, Kelly) (Entered: 12/07/2018)
2018-12-10MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of the Plaintiff's 10 Consent Motion, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall file a Joint Status Report on or before January 11, 2019. This update shall propose a schedule for further proceedings as necessary. Counsel is directed to strictly comply with the Court's 3 Standing Order, including its provisions governing motions for extensions of time. Signed by Judge Trevor N. McFadden on 12/10/2018. (lctnm3) (Entered: 12/10/2018)
2018-12-10Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 1/11/2019. (tg) (Entered: 12/10/2018)
2019-01-0711Consent MOTION to Stay , MOTION for Extension of Time to in Light of Lapse of Appropriations by DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Hudak, Brian) (Entered: 01/07/2019)
2019-01-08MINUTE ORDER: Upon considering the Defendant's 11 Motion to Stay, it is hereby ORDERED that this matter shall be stayed until Congress has restored appropriations to the Department of Justice. It is further ordered that the Defendants will notify the Court immediately upon resumption of appropriations. Signed by Judge Trevor N. McFadden on 1/8/2019. (lctnm3) (Entered: 01/08/2019)
2019-01-3012NOTICE of Restored Funding by DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE (Campbell, Rhonda) (Entered: 01/30/2019)
2019-01-30MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of the Defendant's 12 Notice, the Court hereby lifts the stay in this case. The parties are ORDERED to file a status report with a proposed schedule for further proceedings on or before February 6, 2019. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Trevor N. McFadden on 1/30/19. (lctnm3) (Entered: 01/30/2019)
2019-01-30Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 2/6/2019. (hmc) (Entered: 01/30/2019)
2019-02-0613Joint STATUS REPORT by DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Campbell, Rhonda) (Entered: 02/06/2019)
2019-02-07MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of the parties' 13 Joint Status Report, it is hereby ORDERED that a further report shall be filed on or before March 7, 2019. This report shall propose a schedule for further proceedings as necessary. Signed by Judge Trevor N. McFadden on 2/7/2019. (lctnm3) (Entered: 02/07/2019)
2019-02-07Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 3/7/2019. (hmc) (Entered: 02/07/2019)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar